Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1067629
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
03.09.2004 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 20.10.2004 [2004/43] |
30.07.2004 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
18.06.2004 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect |
|
18.05.2004 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
14.04.2004 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
14.04.2004 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
02.03.2004 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
19.12.2003 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 04.02.2004 [2004/06] |
17.12.2003 |
New entry: Period of grace R.85a / R.108(3) EPC1973: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
05.12.2003 |
First examination report |
|
03.12.2003 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
14.11.2003 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 02.01.2004 [2004/01] |
28.06.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.03.2003 |
Publication of search report |
published on 14.05.2003 [2003/20] |
03.05.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
24.11.2000 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 10.01.2001 [2001/02] |