EP1067629 - Double slot array antenna [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.09.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.10.2004 [2004/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/02] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rulf, Benjamin 3105 Park Place Springfield, New Jersey 07081 / US | 02 /
Tsai, Ming-Ju 28 West Lawn Road Livingston, New Jersey 07039 / US | [2001/02] | Representative(s) | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk, et al Lucent Technologies Inc., 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex IG8 0TU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/02] | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk, et al Lucent Technologies Inc., 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB | Application number, filing date | 00304802.2 | 06.06.2000 | [2001/02] | Priority number, date | US19990335330 | 17.06.1999 Original published format: US 335330 | [2001/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1067629 | Date: | 10.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1067629 | Date: | 14.05.2003 | [2003/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q13/10, H01Q21/08, H01Q21/06, H01Q1/52 | [2001/02] | CPC: |
H01Q21/064 (EP,US);
H01Q13/10 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/06] |
Former [2001/02] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Antennengruppe mit Doppelschlitz | [2001/02] | English: | Double slot array antenna | [2001/02] | French: | Antenne réseau à fentes doubles | [2001/02] | Examination procedure | 31.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/01] | 15.11.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 05.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) FI, SE | 16.04.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/43] | 21.05.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 19.12.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 19.12.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2004 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3653052 (CAMPBELL THOMAS G, et al) [X] 1-10 * column 1, line 65 - column 2, line 6; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US4130822 (CONROY PETER J) [A] 3-5,8-10 * abstract ** column 2, lines 58-61 *; | [X]US4197545 (BERGERON MAURICE A [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * column 2, lines 39-44; figure 4 * * column 4, lines 10-44 *; | [A]US4367475 (SCHIAVONE FRANK J) [A] 3-5,8-10 * column 2, lines 28-41; figure 1 * |