EP1074974 - Secure wireless communication user identification by voice recognition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.03.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.05.2005 [2005/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | [2002/11] |
Former [2001/06] | For all designated states NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD. Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ulvinen, Vesa Kuuselantie 7 90800 Oulu / FI | 02 /
Paloniemi, Jari Ylikiimingintie 169 90900 Kiiminki / FI | [2001/06] | Representative(s) | Read, Matthew Charles, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/06] | Read, Matthew Charles, et al Venner Shipley & Co. 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 00304841.0 | 07.06.2000 | [2001/06] | Priority number, date | US19990326717 | 07.06.1999 Original published format: US 326717 | [2001/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1074974 | Date: | 07.02.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1074974 | Date: | 17.04.2002 | [2002/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G10L17/00, H04M3/493 | [2002/16] | CPC: |
G06Q20/40 (EP,US);
G06Q20/322 (EP,US);
G06Q20/40145 (EP,US);
G07C9/257 (EP,US);
G07C9/27 (EP,US);
G10L17/00 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2001/06] | G10L17/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2003/02] |
Former [2001/06] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Sichere Benutzeridentifizierung über eine drahtlose Kommunikationsverbindung mittels Stimmerkennung | [2001/06] | English: | Secure wireless communication user identification by voice recognition | [2001/06] | French: | Identification sûre d'un utilisateur par liaison de communication par reconnaissance de la voix | [2001/06] | Examination procedure | 02.10.2002 | Examination requested [2002/49] | 22.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/19] | 08.12.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4827518 (FEUSTEL TIMOTHY C [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6-9,13-16,18 * column 1, line 20 - column 2, line 39 ** column 6, line 40 - column 6, line 43 *; | [X]EP0454363 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [X] 1,3,6-8,10,13-16,18 * column 3, line 5 - column 3, line 13 * * column 3, line 52 - column 3, line 56 * * column 4, line 50 - column 5, line 12 *; | [X]US5907597 (MARK ANDREW R [US]) [X] 1,3,6-8,10,13-18,20 * abstract * * column 4, line 32 - column 5, line 18 * * column 9, line 17 - column 9, line 19 * * column 17, line 15 - column 17, line 22 * * column 22, line 4 - column 22, line 26 * * column 23, line 23 - column 23, line 32 * |