EP1061376 - Interactive mri scan control using an in-bore scan control device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 24.08.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 29.07.2009 [2009/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/51] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Darrow, Robert David 71 Spring Road Scotia, New York 12302 / US | 02 /
Dumoulin, Charles Lucian 54 Montrose Court London SW7 2QH / GB | 03 /
Hardy, Christopher Judson 1403 Keyes Avenue Schenectady, New York 12309 / US | [2000/51] | Representative(s) | Goode, Ian Roy, et al London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/31] | Goode, Ian Roy, et al London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | ||
Former [2000/51] | Goode, Ian Roy, et al GE LONDON PATENT OPERATION, Essex House, 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 00304875.8 | 08.06.2000 | [2000/51] | Priority number, date | US19990332087 | 10.06.1999 Original published format: US 332087 | [2000/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1061376 | Date: | 20.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1061376 | Date: | 02.05.2002 | [2002/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G01R33/28, G01R33/54, A61B19/00 | [2002/16] | CPC: |
G01R33/54 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/51] | G01R33/28 | Designated contracting states | DE, NL [2003/04] |
Former [2000/51] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Interaktive Kontrolle einer Aufnahme mittels bildgebender magnetischer Resonanz unter Verwendung eines Aufnahmekontrollgeräts in der Magnetbohrung | [2000/51] | English: | Interactive mri scan control using an in-bore scan control device | [2000/51] | French: | Contrôle interactif de balayage par IRM utilisant un dispositif de contrôle de balayage dans le trou de l'aimant | [2000/51] | Examination procedure | 04.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/01] | 21.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2007 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 03.05.2007 | 03.05.2007 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 08.05.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2007/39] | 18.05.2007 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2007/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2007 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5365927 (ROEMER PETER B [US], et al) [X] 1,3-5,7-19 * column 3, line 55 - column 5, line 26; figure 2 *; | [XA]US5512826 (HARDY CHRISTOPHER J [US], et al) [X] 9,10 * column 3, line 31 - column 7, line 23; figures 1-3 *[A] 2,4,7; | [X]US5526812 (DUMOULIN CHARLES L [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6,8-17,19 * column 3, line 30 - column 5, line 13 * * column 6, line 52 - column 7, line 19; figure 1 *; | [X]US5694142 (DUMOULIN CHARLES LUCIAN [US], et al) [X] 1-15,19 * column 3, line 10 - column 4, line 62 * * column 5, line 51 - column 5, line 57; figures 1,2 *; | [X]WO9832388 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-19 * page 2, line 1 - page 7, line 30; figures 1,2 *; | [X] - SILVERMAN S G ET AL, "INTERACTIVE MR-GUIDED BIOPSY IN AN OPEN-CONFIGURATION MR IMAGING SYSTEM", RADIOLOGY, OAK BROOK,IL, US, (199510), vol. 197, no. 1, ISSN 0033-8419, pages 175 - 181, XP001022638 [X] 1,5,8-18 * see the chapter 'Imaging and Interventional Guidance System' * | [X] - C.J.HARDY, "High-Speed Interactive Imaging for MRT", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SOCIETY OF MAGNETIC RESONANCE, THIRD SCIENTIFIC MEETING AND EXHIBITION, AND THE EUROPEAN SOCIETY FOR MAGNETIC RESONANCE IN MEDICINE AND BIOLOGY, TWELFTH ANNUAL MEETING AND EXHIBITION, NICE, FRANCE, AUGUST 19-25, 1995, vol. 1, page 489, XP002191150 [X] 1,4,5,7-15 * conference abstract * | [X] - D.A.LAMPMAN ET AL., "Optical Probe Tracking on Interventional MRI Systems", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR MAGNETIC RESONANCE IN MEDICINE, FIFTH SCIENTIFIC MEETING AND EXHIBITION, VANCOUVER, B.C., CANADA, APRIL 12-18, 1997, vol. 3, page 1923, XP002191151 [X] 1,3,5,8-18 * conference abstract * | [X] - COUTTS G A ET AL, "Integrated Position Tracking and Imaging of Interventional Tools and Internal Devices Using Small Fiducial Receiver Coils", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR MAGNETIC RESONANCE IN MEDICINE. 5TH SCIENTIFIC MEETING AND EXHIBITION. ISMRM '97. VANCOUVER, BC, APRIL 12 - 18, 1997, PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY OF MAGNETIC RESONANCE IN MEDICINE. SCIENTIFIC, (1997), vol. 3, page 1924, XP002151957 [X] 1,3,5,8-18 * conference abstract * | [X] - SCHAEFFTER T ET AL, "Automatic scan plane definition for frameless MR-stereotaxy on a clinical scanner using an active surgical device holder", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR MAGNETIC RESONANCE IN MEDICINE. SCIENTIFIC MEETING AND EXHIBITION, XX, XX, (19990522), vol. 3, page 1961, XP002151958 [X] 1,3,5,8-18 * conference abstract * |