EP1059400 - Safety gate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.02.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.03.2002 [2002/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Paul, Lees 14 Sonning Drive Wolverhampton, WV9 5QN / GB | For all designated states Prendergast, Paul 14 Sonning Drive Wolverhampton, WV9 5QN / GB | [2000/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/50] | Representative(s) | Swindell & Pearson Limited 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/50] | Swindell & Pearson 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | Application number, filing date | 00304895.6 | 09.06.2000 | [2000/50] | Priority number, date | GB19990013287 | 09.06.1999 Original published format: GB 9913287 | [2000/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1059400 | Date: | 13.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | E04G1/26 | [2000/50] | CPC: |
E04G5/14 (EP);
E04G21/166 (EP);
E06B11/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2001/36] |
Former [2000/50] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Sicherheitsschleuse | [2000/50] | English: | Safety gate | [2000/50] | French: | Sas de sécurité | [2000/50] | Examination procedure | 14.06.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/13] | 11.10.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2002/13] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 25.07.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.07.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.07.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 25.07.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 25.07.2001 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.07.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 25.07.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 25.07.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 25.07.2001 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 25.07.2001 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 25.07.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 25.07.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.07.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.07.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 25.07.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 25.07.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 25.07.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.07.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 25.07.2001 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2005324 (DEXION COMINO INT LTD) [A] 1,4-9,15,16 * page 1, line 57 - page 2, line 61; figure - *; | [A]GB2304137 (WAIGHT CHRISTOPHER ANDREW [GB]) [A] 1,4-6,8 * page 2, paragraph 3 - page 3; figure -; claim - *; | [A]US5709050 (BENKO JOHN C [US]) [A] 1,4-6* the whole document * |