Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2003030079 | 13.02.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US26182402 | 30.09.2002 | US33090099 | 11.06.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100396450B | Global Dossier | 02.09.2003 | B1 | KR20010020969 | 15.03.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US33090099 | 11.06.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3891538B | Global Dossier | 14.03.2007 | B2 | JP2001007304 | 12.01.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US33090099 | 11.06.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1059670 | Global Dossier | 06.08.2003 | A3 | EP1059670 | 13.12.2000 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US33090099 | 11.06.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6506643 | 14.01.2003 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US33090099 | 11.06.1999 |