Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
03.06.2005 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.07.2005 [2005/29] |
12.10.2004 | Deletion: Fee payment for extension state | |
12.10.2004 | Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state | |
18.06.2004 | Definitive list of designations | published on 04.08.2004 [2004/32] |
16.06.2004 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
21.05.2004 | Request for examination filed | published on 07.07.2004 [2004/28] |
26.09.2003 | Publication of search report | published on 12.11.2003 [2003/46] |
22.08.2003 | Change - applicant | published on 08.10.2003 [2003/41] |
11.06.2003 | Renewal fee | |
13.07.2002 | Renewal fee | |
19.10.2001 | Change - representative | published on 05.12.2001 [2001/49] |
03.11.2000 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 20.12.2000 [2000/51] |