EP1061653 - Analog gain control adjustment using a probabilistic algorithm [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.06.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2005 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.07.2005 [2005/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nortel Networks Limited 2351 Boulevard Alfred-Nobel St. Laurent, QC H4S 2A9 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2003/41] | For all designated states Nortel Networks Limited 2351 Boulevard Alfred-Nobel St. Laurent, Quebec H4S 2A9 / CA | ||
Former [2000/51] | For all designated states Nortel Networks Limited World Trade Center of Montreal, 380 St. Antoine Street West, 8th floor Montreal, Quebec H2Y 3Y4 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pakravan, Mohammed Reza No. 71-146 Stewart Street Ottawa, Ontario K1N 6J7 / CA | 02 /
Harris, Gwendolyn Kate 820 Roseview Avenue Ottawa, Ontario K2B 6J4 / CA | [2000/51] | Representative(s) | Coyle, Philip Aidan, et al FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/49] | Coyle, Philip Aidan, et al F. R. KELLY & CO. 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE | ||
Former [2000/51] | Dearling, Bruce Clive, et al Hepworth Lawrence Bryer & Bizley, Merlin House, Falconry Court, Bakers Lane Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 00305110.9 | 16.06.2000 | [2000/51] | Priority number, date | US19990335836 | 18.06.1999 Original published format: US 335836 | [2000/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1061653 | Date: | 20.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1061653 | Date: | 12.11.2003 | [2003/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H03M1/18 | [2000/51] | CPC: |
H03M1/185 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/32] |
Former [2000/51] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Einstellung einer analogen Verstärkungsregelung mit Hilfe eines probabilistischen Algorithmus | [2000/51] | English: | Analog gain control adjustment using a probabilistic algorithm | [2000/51] | French: | Ajustement d'un étage de commande de gain analogique en utilisant un algorithme probabilistique | [2000/51] | Examination procedure | 12.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/28] | 24.05.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPH09321559 ; | [Y]US3671867 (SCHWARZ HANS G) [Y] 2-4 * column 2, line 23 - column 3, line 68; figure 1 *; | [A]US5121117 (RABII KHOSRO M [US]) [A] 1-23 * column 2, line 39 - line 59; figure 1 *; | [A]US5206647 (STONE WADE J [US]) [A] 1-23 * column 4, line 31 - column 5, line 14; figure 1 *; | [A]US5365233 (SCHAUB ARTHUR [CH]) [A] 1-23 * column 2, line 57 - line 68; figures 1,2 *; | [A]WO9530275 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [A] 1-23 * page 14, line 27 - page 15, line 37; figure 7 *; | [L]US5946607 (SHIINO HARUHIRO [JP], et al) [L] 1-4,9-13* considered as translation of JP09321559; column 3, line 10 - column 4, line 10; figures 1,3 * | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980331), vol. 1998, no. 04, & JP09321559 A 19971212 (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1,9-13 * abstract * * figures 1,3 * [Y] 2-4 |