EP1063519 - Gas sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.03.2014 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NGK SPARK PLUG CO., LTD. 14-18 Takatsuji-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya Aichi / JP | [2013/09] |
Former [2000/52] | For all designated states NGK Spark Plug Company Limited 14-18, Takatsuji-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya, Aichi / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miyata, Hiroshi, c/o NGK Spark Plug Co., Ltd. 14-18 Takatsuji-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya, Aichi / JP | [2013/21] |
Former [2000/52] | 01 /
Miyata, Hiroshi, c/o NGK Spark Plug Co., Ltd. 14-18 Takatsuji-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya, Aichi / JP | Representative(s) | Nicholls, Michael John J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [2013/21] |
Former [2000/52] | Nicholls, Michael John J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 00305200.8 | 20.06.2000 | [2000/52] | Priority number, date | JP19990174257 | 21.06.1999 Original published format: JP 17425799 | [2000/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1063519 | Date: | 27.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1063519 | Date: | 22.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/407 | [2000/52] | CPC: |
G01N27/4077 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2001/37] |
Former [2000/52] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Gassensor | [2000/52] | English: | Gas sensor | [2000/52] | French: | Capteur de gaz | [2000/52] | Examination procedure | 07.06.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/32] | 02.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.04.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 05.04.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.05.2008 | Opposition(s) | 25.02.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 14.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 22.05.2013 | FR | 22.07.2013 | GB | 22.08.2013 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/24] | IT | 22.05.2013 | |
FR | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | IT | 22.05.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4362609 (SANO HIROMI, et al) [Y] 1 * abstract * * column 1, line 47 - column 2, line 60; figure 1 *; | [Y]US4786399 (WERTHEIMER HARRY P [US], et al) [Y] 1 * abstract * * column 6, line 16 - line 46; figure 2 *; | [A]US5785829 (WATANABE ISAO [JP]) [A] 1-4 * abstract ** column 6, line 1 - line 10; figure 1 * |