EP1070746 - Moldable silicone rubber sponge composition, silicone rubber sponge, and method for producing silicone rubber sponge [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.07.2006 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow Corning Toray Silicone Co., Ltd. 1-3, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/04] | For all designated states Dow Corning Toray Silicone Co., Ltd. 1-3, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Honma, Hiroshi Dow Corning Toray Silicone Comp. Ltd., 2-2 Chigusa Kaigan, Ichihara-shi, Chiba Prefecture / JP | 02 /
Hamada, Mitsuo Dow Corning Toray Silicone Comp. Ltd., 2-2 Chigusa Kaigan, Ichihara-shi, Chiba Prefecture / JP | [2001/04] | Representative(s) | Kyle, Diana Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/04] | Kyle, Diana Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 00305201.6 | 20.06.2000 | [2001/04] | Priority number, date | JP19990204781 | 19.07.1999 Original published format: JP 20478199 | JP19990239304 | 26.08.1999 Original published format: JP 23930499 | JP20000067112 | 10.03.2000 Original published format: JP 2000067112 | [2001/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1070746 | Date: | 24.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1070746 | Date: | 29.05.2002 | [2002/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1070746 | Date: | 31.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C08L83/07, C08K7/22, C08J9/32 | [2002/22] | CPC: |
C08J9/32 (EP,US);
C08L83/04 (EP,KR,US);
C08J9/0066 (EP,US);
C08K3/36 (EP,US);
C08G77/12 (EP,US);
C08G77/20 (EP,US);
C08J2383/04 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1376 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249972 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2985 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L83/04, C08L2666/04, C08L2666/54 (EP,US);
C08L83/04, C08L2666/14, C08L2666/54 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2001/04] | C08L83/07, C08K7/22 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/04] | Title | German: | Formbare Siliconschaumgummizusammensetzung, Siliconschaumgummi und Verfahren zur Herstellung | [2005/28] | English: | Moldable silicone rubber sponge composition, silicone rubber sponge, and method for producing silicone rubber sponge | [2001/04] | French: | Composition caoutchouc mousse de silicone moulable par injection, éponge de caoutchouc de silicone et méthode pour la préparation | [2001/04] |
Former [2001/04] | Spritzgiessbare Siliconschaumgummi-Zusammensetzung, Siliconschaumgummi und Verfahren zur Herstellung | Examination procedure | 16.10.2002 | Examination requested [2002/50] | 07.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 16.03.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 31.08.2005 | BE | 31.08.2005 | CH | 31.08.2005 | CY | 31.08.2005 | FI | 31.08.2005 | LI | 31.08.2005 | NL | 31.08.2005 | DK | 30.11.2005 | GR | 30.11.2005 | SE | 30.11.2005 | PT | 22.02.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2006/26] | AT | 31.08.2005 | |
BE | 31.08.2005 | ||
CH | 31.08.2005 | ||
FI | 31.08.2005 | ||
LI | 31.08.2005 | ||
NL | 31.08.2005 | ||
DK | 30.11.2005 | ||
GR | 30.11.2005 | ||
SE | 30.11.2005 | ||
PT | 22.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 31.08.2005 | |
BE | 31.08.2005 | ||
CH | 31.08.2005 | ||
FI | 31.08.2005 | ||
LI | 31.08.2005 | ||
NL | 31.08.2005 | ||
GR | 30.11.2005 | ||
SE | 30.11.2005 | ||
PT | 22.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/22] | AT | 31.08.2005 | |
CH | 31.08.2005 | ||
FI | 31.08.2005 | ||
LI | 31.08.2005 | ||
NL | 31.08.2005 | ||
GR | 30.11.2005 | ||
SE | 30.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 31.08.2005 | |
CH | 31.08.2005 | ||
FI | 31.08.2005 | ||
LI | 31.08.2005 | ||
GR | 30.11.2005 | ||
SE | 30.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 31.08.2005 | |
FI | 31.08.2005 | ||
SE | 30.11.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0553843 (DOW CORNING TORAY SILICONE [JP]) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]EP0821027 (DOW CORNING TORAY SILICONE [JP]) [A] 1* claim 1 *; | [A]US5750581 (BRENNENSTUHL WERNER [DE], et al) [A] 1-16 * claim 1 * |