EP1063056 - Method and apparatus for measuring a pad profile and closed loop control of a pad conditioning process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.05.2004 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 23.12.2009 [2009/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Applied Materials, Inc. 3050 Bowers Avenue Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/52] | For all designated states Applied Materials, Inc. 3050 Bowers Avenue Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Garretson, Charles C. 1384 Hester Avenue San Jose California 95126 / US | 02 /
Benvegnu, Dominic P.O. Box 382, 25 Entrada Way La Honda, CA 94020 / US | [2001/03] |
Former [2000/52] | 01 /
Garretson, Charles C. 159 Emerson Street No.3 Palo Alto, California 94301 / US | ||
02 /
Benvegnu, Dominic P.O. Box 382, 25 Entrada Way La Honda, CA 94020 / US | Representative(s) | Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2000/52] | Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril, et al BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 00305242.0 | 21.06.2000 | [2000/52] | Priority number, date | US19990338357 | 22.06.1999 Original published format: US 338357 | [2000/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1063056 | Date: | 27.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1063056 | Date: | 26.03.2003 | [2003/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B24B53/007, B24B37/04, B24B49/12, // H01L21/306 | [2000/52] | CPC: |
B24B53/017 (EP);
B24B49/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2003/51] |
Former [2000/52] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Messen eines Polierkissenprofils und Steuerung mit geschlossenem Regelkreis eines Polierkissen Aufbereitungsverfahren | [2000/52] | English: | Method and apparatus for measuring a pad profile and closed loop control of a pad conditioning process | [2000/52] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour mesurer le profil d'un tampon de polissage et commande en boucle fermée du processus de dressage d'un tampon | [2000/52] | Examination procedure | 27.09.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/26] | 22.01.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2004/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 05.11.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.2003 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.2003 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.2003 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 05.11.2003 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2003 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5655951 (MEIKLE SCOTT G [US], et al) [A] 1,11,15 * column A *; | [A]US5681212 (HAYAKAWA HIDEAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1,11,15 * column A; figure - *; | [X]EP0823309 (MEMC ELECTRONIC MATERIALS [US]) [X] 1-20 * column 7, line 26 - column 8, line 3; figures 6,7 *; | [X]EP0829327 (SPEEDFAM CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-20 * column 5, line 10 - column 7, line 23 *; | [DA]US5875559 (BIRANG MANOOCHER [US], et al) [DA] 1,11,15* column A; figure - * |