EP1065694 - Plasma display panel and driving method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.04.2008 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.05.2008 [2008/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung SDI Co. Ltd. 575, Shin-dong, Paldal-gu Suwon-city Kyonggi-do / KR | [2007/22] |
Former [2001/01] | For all designated states Samsung SDI Co. Ltd. 575, Shin-dong, Paldal-gu Suwon-city, Kyonggi-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kang, Kyoung-ho 101-1504 Samil, San 18-1 Dongsan-ri, Tangjeon-myeo Asan-city, Chungcheongnam-do / KR | 02 /
Ryeom, Jeong-duk 205-1505 Dure Hyundai 2-danji, 978 Shinbang-dong Cheonan-city, Chungcheongnam-do / KR | 03 /
Lee, Seong-charn 220-701 Jugong Apt., Sangkye 6-dong, Nowon-gu Seoul / KR | [2001/01] | Representative(s) | Ertl, Nicholas Justin Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/01] | Ertl, Nicholas Justin Elkington and Fife, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 00305421.0 | 28.06.2000 | [2001/01] | Priority number, date | KR19990025805 | 30.06.1999 Original published format: KR 9925805 | [2001/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1065694 | Date: | 03.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1065694 | Date: | 18.07.2001 | [2001/29] | Type: | A8 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP1065694 | Date: | 25.07.2001 | [2001/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1065694 | Date: | 30.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/22] |
Former [2001/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | |
No.: | EP1065694 | ||
Date: | |||
Status: | (deleted) | ||
[2001/16] | |||
[2001/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H01J17/49, G09F9/313 | [2001/01] | CPC: |
H01J11/46 (EP,US);
H01J11/22 (KR);
G09G3/2022 (EP,US);
G09G3/296 (KR);
G09G3/298 (EP,US);
H01J11/12 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2002/15] |
Former [2001/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Plasma-Anzeigetafel und Verfahren zur Steuerung derselben | [2001/01] | English: | Plasma display panel and driving method thereof | [2001/01] | French: | Panneau d'affichage à plasma et procédé de commande dudit panneau | [2001/01] | Examination procedure | 23.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/30] | 28.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.04.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 11.04.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH05290742 ; | [A]JPH06314066 ; | [A]US3996490 (MILLER DONALD E) [A] 1,7,11 * column 1, line 62 - column 2, line 6; figure 1 * * column 5, line 4 - line 9 *; | [A]EP0762373 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [A] 15 * column 13, line 48 - column 14, line 6; figure 4 * * column 17, line 21 - column 18, line 52 *; | [A]EP0896316 (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP [JP]) [A] 15* column 2, line 55 - column 3, line 1 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940207), vol. 018, no. 073, Database accession no. (E - 1503), & JP05290742 A 19931105 (FUJITSU LTD) [X] 1,3 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950331), vol. 1995, no. 02, & JP06314066 A 19941108 (FUJITSU LTD) [A] 1,7,11 * abstract * |