EP1069173 - Non-inflammable matter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.06.2002 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.08.2002 [2002/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shafaei, Manoochehr 3, Wootten Drive Iffley Oxford OX4 4DS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/03] | For all designated states Shafaei, Manoochehr 3, Wootten Drive Iffley, Oxford OX4 4DS / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2001/03] | Representative(s) | Marlow, Nicholas Simon, et al Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/03] | Marlow, Nicholas Simon, et al Reddie & Grose 16, Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 00305670.2 | 05.07.2000 | [2001/03] | Priority number, date | GB19990015630 | 05.07.1999 Original published format: GB 9915630 | [2001/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1069173 | Date: | 17.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C09K21/02, C09D5/18, D06M11/82 | [2001/03] | CPC: |
C09K21/02 (EP);
H05K1/0373 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | [2001/40] |
Former [2001/03] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Nichtentflammbarer Stoff | [2001/03] | English: | Non-inflammable matter | [2001/03] | French: | Matériau non-inflammable | [2001/03] | Examination procedure | 18.07.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/33] | 30.01.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2002/33] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 11.09.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.09.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.09.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 11.09.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 11.09.2001 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.09.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 11.09.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 11.09.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 11.09.2001 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 11.09.2001 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 11.09.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 11.09.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.09.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.09.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 11.09.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 11.09.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 11.09.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.09.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 11.09.2001 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1242290 (STIFTELSEN WALLBOARDINDUSTRIEN [SE]) [A] 1,6,8,12 * example 2 *; | [A]US4065413 (MACINNIS MARTIN B, et al) [A] 1,6,8,12 * the whole document *; | [A]US4174223 (STEEN DONALD M [US]) [A] 1,6,8,12 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9100327 (OBERLEY WILLIAM J [US]) [A] 1,6,8,12* the whole document *; | [A]EP0889110 (SHAFAHIE MANOUCHEHER [IR]) [A] 1,6,8,12 * claims 1,2 * |