EP1073300 - Method providing variable information to wireless system users [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.04.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.04.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.05.2006 [2006/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nortel Networks Limited 2351 Boulevard Alfred-Nobel St. Laurent, QC H4S 2A9 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2003/41] | For all designated states Nortel Networks Limited 2351 Boulevard Alfred-Nobel St. Laurent, Quebec H4S 2A9 / CA | ||
Former [2001/05] | For all designated states Nortel Networks Limited World Trade Center of Montreal, 380 St. Antoine Street West, 8th floor Montreal, Quebec H2Y 3Y4 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stephens, Gary Boyd 4001 Binley Drive Richardson, Texas 75082 / US | [2001/05] | Representative(s) | Free, Rachel Alder, et al Scott & York Intellectual Property Ltd 45 Grosvenor Road St. Albans Hertfordshire AL1 3AW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/05] | Christophers, Rachel Alder, et al Sommerville & Rushton, Business Link Building, 45 Grosvenor Road St. Albans, Hertfordshire AL1 3AW / GB | Application number, filing date | 00305917.7 | 12.07.2000 | [2001/05] | Priority number, date | US19990365266 | 30.07.1999 Original published format: US 365266 | [2001/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1073300 | Date: | 31.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1073300 | Date: | 21.03.2001 | [2001/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/38, H04M15/00, H04M3/487 | [2001/12] | CPC: |
H04M15/83 (EP);
H04M15/00 (EP);
H04M15/8083 (EP);
H04M3/36 (EP);
H04M3/4872 (EP);
H04W4/24 (EP);
H04M2203/205 (EP);
H04M2207/18 (EP);
H04M2215/0184 (EP);
H04M2215/2026 (EP);
H04M2215/32 (EP);
H04M2215/82 (EP);
H04M3/42017 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2001/05] | H04Q7/38 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/50] |
Former [2001/05] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Zustellung variabeler Informationen an Teilnehmer eines drahtloses System | [2001/05] | English: | Method providing variable information to wireless system users | [2001/05] | French: | Procédé de remise d'information variable aux utilisateurs d'un système sans fil | [2001/05] | Examination procedure | 11.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/28] | 15.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/22] | 02.01.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2005 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5794140 (SAWYER FRANCOIS [CA]) [X] 1,3-8,10-14,16-20,24-26 * column 4, line 41 - column 6, line 24 * * column 7, line 42 - column 12, line 40 * * figure - *; | [X]WO9839937 (ERICSSON GE MOBILE INC [US]) [X] 1,3-8,10-14,16-20,24-26 * page 4, line 28 - page 9, line 11 ** figure - * |