Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
10.12.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.01.2005 [2005/04] |
28.09.2004 | Deletion: Fee payment for extension state | |
28.09.2004 | Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state | |
31.08.2004 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
17.08.2004 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
04.06.2004 | Definitive list of designations | published on 21.07.2004 [2004/30] |
01.06.2004 | New entry: Period of grace R.85a / R.108(3) EPC1973: despatch of communication + time limit | |
01.06.2004 | New entry: Period of grace R.85b EPC 1973: despatch of communication + time limit | |
12.09.2003 | Publication of search report | published on 29.10.2003 [2003/44] |
08.07.2003 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
30.05.2003 | Change - classification | published on 16.07.2003 [2003/29] |
17.05.2002 | Renewal fee | |
05.01.2001 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 21.02.2001 [2001/08] |