EP1077033 - Process for making masa flour and steaming device therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.12.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.12.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.01.2005 [2005/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Northern Foods Grocery Group Limited P.O. Box 3, Eastgate Worksop Notts S80 1QY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/08] | For all designated states Northern Foods Grocery Group Limited P.O. Box 3, Eastgate Worksop, Notts S80 1QY / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Knight, Peter c/o Smith Flour Mills Albion Mills PO Box 3 Eastgate, Workshop Notts, S80 1QY / GB | 02 /
Clack, Simon c/o Smith Flour Mills Albion Mills PO Box 3 Eastgate, Workshop Notts, S80 1QY / GB | 03 /
Craddock, Robert c/o Smith Flour Mills Albion Mills PO Box 3 Eastgate, Workshop Notts, S80 1QY / GB | [2001/08] | Representative(s) | Stuttard, Garry Philip Murgitroyd & Company Leeds Studio 3 84 Albion Street Leeds LS1 6AG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/08] | Stuttard, Garry Philip Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Tower House Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 00306146.2 | 19.07.2000 | [2001/08] | Priority number, date | GB19990019395 | 18.08.1999 Original published format: GB 9919395 | GB20000011835 | 17.05.2000 Original published format: GB 0011835 | [2001/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1077033 | Date: | 21.02.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1077033 | Date: | 29.10.2003 | [2003/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/10, A47J27/00 | [2003/29] | CPC: |
B02B1/08 (EP,US);
A23L7/198 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/08] | A23L1/10 | Designated contracting states | [2004/30] |
Former [2001/08] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Masa-Mehl sowie Dämpfer hierfür | [2001/08] | English: | Process for making masa flour and steaming device therefor | [2001/08] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de farine masa et appareil de traitement à la vapeur correspondant | [2001/08] | Examination procedure | 30.04.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/04] | 24.08.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2005/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 08.06.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 08.06.2004 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2004 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4594260 (VAQUEIRO M CRISTINA [MX], et al) [X] 1-16 * figure 1 * * column 1, line 10 - column 6, line 26 * * column 7, line 52 - column 9, line 22 *; | [A]US5652010 (GIMMLER NORBERT [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * column 3, line 60 - column 5, line 43 *; | [A] - GÓMEZ-ALDALPA C., MARTÍNEZ-BUSTOS F., FIGUEROA C.J.D., ORDORICA F.C.A., "A comparison of the quality of whole corn tortillas made from instant corn flours by traditional or extrusion processing", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF FOOD SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, vol. 34, no. 4, ISSN 0950-5423, (199908), pages 391 - 399, URL: http://www.blackwell-synergy.com, (20030512), XP002241356 [A] 1-16 * page 393, column L, paragraph L - column R, paragraph 3; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1365-2621.1999.00287.x | [A] - ROONEY L.W., SUHENDRO E.L., "Perspectives on nixtamalization (alkaline cooking) of maize for tortillas and snacks", CEREAL FOODS WORLD, (199907), vol. 44, no. 7, ISSN 0146-6283, pages 466 - 470, XP009010744 [A] 1-16 * page 468, paragraph CHEMISTRY - paragraph TORTILLA * | [A] - PARADES-LÓPEZ O., SAHARÓPULOS-PARADES M.E., "Maize. A review of tortilla production technology", BAKERS' DIGEST, (19830913), vol. 57, no. 5, ISSN 0191-6114, pages 16 - 20,22,25, XP001147497 [A] 1-16 * page 19, paragraphs TORTILLA-MAKING - page 22, column R, paragraph L * | [A] - GOMEZ M.H., ROONEY L.W., WANISKA R.D., PFLUGFELDER R.L., "Dry corn masa flours for tortilla and snack food production", CEREAL FOODS WORLD, (198705), vol. 32, no. 5, ISSN 0146-6283, pages 372 - 373,375-377, XP009010882 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * | [A] - BEDOLLA S., ROONEY L.W., "Cooking maize for masa production", CEREAL FOODS WORLD, (1982), vol. 27, no. 5, ISSN 0146-6283, pages 219 - 221, XP009010956 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * |