EP1070887 - Brush seal having secured bristles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.12.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.12.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.02.2006 [2006/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/04] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aksit, Mahmut Faruk 26 25th Street Troy, NY 12180 / US | 02 /
Dinc, Osman Saim 107 Nyroy Drive Troy, NY 12180 / US | 03 /
Mayer, Robert Russell 5 Cimino Lane, Apartment 4 Schenectady, NY 12306 / US | [2001/04] | Representative(s) | Pedder, James Cuthbert, et al London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/04] | Pedder, James Cuthbert, et al GE London Patent Operation, Essex House, 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 00306177.7 | 20.07.2000 | [2001/04] | Priority number, date | US20000505804 | 17.02.2000 Original published format: US 505804 | US19990145049P | 22.07.1999 Original published format: US 145049 P | [2001/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1070887 | Date: | 24.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1070887 | Date: | 21.08.2002 | [2002/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F16J15/32 | [2001/04] | CPC: |
F16J15/3288 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [2003/20] |
Former [2001/04] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Bürstendichtung mit befestigten Borsten | [2001/04] | English: | Brush seal having secured bristles | [2001/04] | French: | Joint à brosses comportant des brosses fixées | [2001/04] | Examination procedure | 21.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/17] | 28.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.08.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/07] | 13.09.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/07] | Request for further processing for: | 19.03.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 19.03.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.04.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2001400 (ROLLS ROYCE) [A] 1-3,8,9,12-15 * page 2, column R, line 74 - line 84 *; | [A]US4600202 (SCHAEFFLER ARTHUR [DE], et al) [A] 13-15 * claims 4,5 *; | [A]US4809990 (MERZ HERBERT [DE]) [A] 11* abstract *; | [X]DE19642781 (MTU MUENCHEN GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-12 * column 2, line 36 - column 3, line 34; figure - * |