EP1073109 - Single phase perovskite ferroelectric film on platinum electrode and method for forming same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.05.2011 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.06.2011 [2011/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/05] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka 545-8522 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Li, Tingkai 18701 SE, 23rd Street Vancouver, WA 98683 / US | 02 /
Zhang, Fengyan 16804 SE, 32nd Street Vancouver, WA 98683 / US | 03 /
Hsu, Sheng Teng 2216 NW Trout Court Camas, WA 98607 / US | [2001/05] | Representative(s) | Jacob, Reuben Ellis, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Jacob, Reuben Ellis, et al R G C Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | ||
Former [2008/08] | Jacob, Reuben Ellis, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | ||
Former [2001/05] | West, Alan Harry, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 00306349.2 | 26.07.2000 | [2001/05] | Priority number, date | US19990363245 | 28.07.1999 Original published format: US 363245 | [2001/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1073109 | Date: | 31.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1073109 | Date: | 16.04.2003 | [2003/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/316 | [2001/05] | CPC: |
C23C16/409 (EP);
H01L27/105 (KR);
H01L21/02197 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/02205 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/02271 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/02337 (US);
H01L28/55 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/02] |
Former [2001/05] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Perovskitfilm auf einer Platinelektrode bestehend aus einer einzelnen Phase | [2001/05] | English: | Single phase perovskite ferroelectric film on platinum electrode and method for forming same | [2001/05] | French: | Couche de perovskite à phase unique sur une électrode de Platine et methode de sa fabrication | [2001/05] | Examination procedure | 01.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/35] | 17.10.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 03.02.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 30.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/24] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.11.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 20.11.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.11.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.11.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 20.11.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 20.11.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 20.11.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 20.11.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 20.11.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 20.11.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.11.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.11.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 20.11.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 20.11.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 20.11.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.11.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH10275896 ; | [X]US5874364 (NAKABAYASHI MASAAKI [JP], et al); | [X]US5889299 (ABE KAZUHIDE [JP], et al); |