EP1076339 - Tape head with support bars [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.07.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.09.2005 [2005/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUANTUM CORPORATION 501 Sycamore Drive Milpitas, CA 95035 / US | [2001/34] |
Former [2001/07] | For all designated states QUANTUM CORPORATION 500 McCarthy Boulevard Milpitas California 95035 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rumpler, Allen G. 4757 Peaceful Lane Pleasanton, CA 94566 / US | 02 /
Lau, Ming Ho 45 Commons Drive No 412 Shewsbury, Massachusetts 01545 / US | 03 /
Remby, James R. 23 Nicholas Road Hopkinton, Massachusetts 01748 / US | [2001/07] | Representative(s) | Charig, Raymond Julian Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/07] | Charig, Raymond Julian Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 00306587.7 | 02.08.2000 | [2001/07] | Priority number, date | US19990370456 | 09.08.1999 Original published format: US 370456 | [2001/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1076339 | Date: | 14.02.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1076339 | Date: | 05.06.2002 | [2002/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G11B5/31, G11B5/105, G11B21/00 | [2002/23] | CPC: |
G11B5/00813 (EP,US);
G11B5/10 (EP,US);
G11B5/48 (EP,US);
G11B5/4893 (EP,US);
G11B5/584 (EP,US);
G11B5/2651 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2001/07] | G11B21/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2003/09] |
Former [2001/07] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Magnetkopf mit Tragprofil | [2001/07] | English: | Tape head with support bars | [2001/07] | French: | Tête de bande avec barre de support | [2001/07] | Examination procedure | 01.03.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/36] | 13.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/46] | 28.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.08.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 26.08.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.04.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2004 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0515786 (READ RITE CORP [US]) [X] 1-5,7-12,15-21 * the whole document *; | [A]US5513057 (ZIEREN VICTOR [NL], et al) [A] 1-21 * column 4, line 19 - column 5, line 52; figures 2-4 *; | [A]WO9705603 (QUANTUM CORP [US]) [A] 1-21* abstract *; | [A]US5883770 (BISKEBORN ROBERT GLENN [US], et al) [A] 1-21 * column 4, line 16 - column 6, line 25; figures 1-6,11-14 * |