EP1127504 - Athletic shoe sole design and construction [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.08.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.10.2005 [2005/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MIZUNO CORPORATION 1-23, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-8538 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/35] | For all designated states Mizuno Corporation 1-23, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-8538 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kita, Kenjiro 12-35, Nanko-kita 1-chome, Suminoe-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka, 559-8510 / JP | [2001/35] | Representative(s) | Abbie, Andrew Kenneth, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/35] | Abbie, Andrew Kenneth, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 00306793.1 | 09.08.2000 | [2001/35] | Priority number, date | JP20000049105 | 25.02.2000 Original published format: JP 2000049105 | [2001/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1127504 | Date: | 29.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1127504 | Date: | 20.11.2002 | [2002/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1127504 | Date: | 13.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A43B7/08, A43B7/06, A43B13/14 | [2002/47] | CPC: |
A43B7/082 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/35] | A43B7/08 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2003/32] |
Former [2001/35] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Gestaltung und Aufbau einer Mittelsohle für Athletikschuhe | [2001/35] | English: | Athletic shoe sole design and construction | [2001/35] | French: | Conception et construction de la semelle intermédiaire d'une chaussure d'athlétisme | [2001/35] | Examination procedure | 06.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/15] | 02.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 04.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB472955 (US RUBBER PROD INC) [A] 1,7,8 * the whole document *; | [AY]US4000566 (FAMOLARE JR JOSEPH P) [A] 1 * the whole document * [Y] 7,8; | [A]US4438573 (MCBARRON GEORGE P [US]) [A] 1,7,8 * the whole document *; | [A]US4813160 (KUZNETZ LAWRENCE [US]) [A] 1,7,8* the whole document *; | [AY]US5408761 (GAZZANO RICHARD [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document * [Y] 7,8; | [PAY]US6092305 (TROY GARY J [US], et al) [PA] 1 * the whole document * [Y] 7,8 | by applicant | JPS6343923 | JPH08131204 |