EP1078999 - System and method for fabricating organic electroluminescent display devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.04.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2002 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.06.2002 [2002/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TDK Corporation 1-13-1, Nihonbashi, Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/09] | For all designated states TDK Corporation 1-13-1, Nihonbashi Chuo-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hiroshi, Tanabe TDK Corporation, 1-13-1, Nihonbashi, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8272 / JP | 02 /
Tokura, Satoshi TDK Corporation, 1-13-1, Nihonbashi, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8272 / JP | [2001/09] | Representative(s) | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow, G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/09] | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Raworth, Moss & Cook, Raworth House, 36 Sydenham Road Croydon, Surrey CRO 2EF / GB | Application number, filing date | 00307026.5 | 16.08.2000 | [2001/09] | Priority number, date | JP19990233654 | 20.08.1999 Original published format: JP 23365499 | [2001/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1078999 | Date: | 28.02.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/09] | Classification | IPC: | C23C14/12, H01L51/20, H01L51/40 | [2001/09] | CPC: |
C23C14/12 (EP);
C23C14/24 (EP);
H10K50/11 (EP);
H10K71/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von organischen elektrolumineszierenden Anzeigevorrichtungen | [2001/09] | English: | System and method for fabricating organic electroluminescent display devices | [2001/09] | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication de dispositifs d'affichage électroluminescents organiques | [2001/09] | Examination procedure | 12.04.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/23] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |