EP1083492 - History-based document differencing showing nature of differences [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.07.2002 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Adobe Systems, Inc. 345 Park Avenue San Jose California 95110 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/11] | For all designated states Adobe Systems, Inc. 345 Park Avenue San Jose, California 95110 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ayers, Robert M. 679 Waverly Street Palo Alto, California 94301 / US | 02 /
Sites, Richard L. 145 Campo Bello Lane Menlo Park, California 94025 / US | 03 /
Pravetz, James D. 270 Hazelton Avenue Sunnyvale, California 94086-4306 / US | [2001/11] | Representative(s) | Wombwell, Francis, et al Forresters 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Wombwell, Francis, et al Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | ||
Former [2001/11] | Wombwell, Francis, et al Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | Application number, filing date | 00307084.4 | 18.08.2000 | [2001/11] | Priority number, date | US19990389843 | 02.09.1999 Original published format: US 389843 | [2001/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1083492 | Date: | 14.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1083492 | Date: | 16.05.2001 | [2001/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/24, G06F17/30, G06F17/60 | [2001/20] | CPC: |
G06F40/197 (EP);
G06F40/174 (EP);
G06F40/194 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2001/11] | G06F17/24, G06F17/30 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2002/07] |
Former [2001/11] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vergangenheitsbasierte Bestimmung der Unterschiede zwischen verschiedenen Versionen eines Dokuments mit Darstellung der Art der Unterschiede | [2001/11] | English: | History-based document differencing showing nature of differences | [2001/11] | French: | Détermination des differences entre differentes versions d'un document fondée sur son historique avec présentation du genre de differences | [2001/11] | Examination procedure | 17.11.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/36] | 05.04.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2002/36] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 04.01.2002 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.01.2002 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.01.2002 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 04.01.2002 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0843266 (ADOBE SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 9,10,12,15 * page 4, line 20 - line 26; figure 2 ** abstract *; | [XA]WO9830968 (DOCUMENT DIRECTIONS INC [US]) [X] 1,2,8,9,13,14 * page 10, line 3 - line 18; figure 9 * * page 11, line 18 - page 12, line 5; figure 13 * * page 12, line 14 - page 13, line 6; figure 15 * * page 19, line 20 - page 21, line 4; figures 26,27 * [A] 10,12,15,17; | [X]US5809513 (OKISHIMA HARUHIRO [JP]) [X] 1-3,5,6,13 * column 4, line 32 - line 44; figure 3 * * column 6, line 29 - line 67; figure 8 *; | [X] - WAGNER T A ET AL, "EFFICIENT SELF-VERSIONING DOCUMENTS", PROCEEDINGS OF IEEE COMPCON, LOS ALAMITOS, USA, IEEE COMP. SOC. PRESS, (19970223), ISBN 0-8186-7805-4, pages 62 - 67, XP000751762 [X] 1-3,5,13 * page 63, column R, line 33 - page 64, column R, line 7; table 1 * * page 66, column L, line 1 - line 15; figure 3 * |