EP1078640 - Air freshening composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.05.2006 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): LU | published on 27.06.2007 [2007/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INTERNATIONAL FLAVORS & FRAGRANCES INC. 521 West 57th Street New York, NY 10019 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/09] | For all designated states INTERNATIONAL FLAVORS & FRAGRANCES INC. 521 West 57th Street New York New York 10019 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Van Walsum, Arnoud Lamoen 20 3763 ZS Soest / NL | 02 /
Boden, Richard M. 30 Seward Drive Ocean, Monmouth, New Jersey 07712 / US | 03 /
Ruizendaal, Jan-Willem Zacharias v. Dompselaerstraat 13 3772 AC Barneveld / NL | 04 /
White, Michael John Robert Rapenburg 41-111 1011 TV Amsterdam / NL | [2001/26] |
Former [2001/09] | 01 /
van Walsum, Arnoud Klarinetsingel 166 3335 DE Zwyndrecht / NL | ||
02 /
Boden, Richard M. 30 Seward Drive Ocean, Monmouth, New Jersey 07712 / US | |||
03 /
Ruizendaal, Jan-Willem Zacharias v. Dompselaerstraat 13 3772 AC Barneveld / NL | |||
04 /
White, Michael John Robert Rapenburg 41-111 1011 TV Amsterdam / NL | Representative(s) | Richardson, Kate Forrester & Boehmert, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/09] | Richardson, Kate Forrester & Boehmert, Franz-Joseph Strasse 38 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00307149.5 | 21.08.2000 | [2001/09] | Priority number, date | US19990383969 | 26.08.1999 Original published format: US 383969 | [2001/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1078640 | Date: | 28.02.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1078640 | Date: | 20.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61L9/04, A61L9/01 | [2001/09] | CPC: |
A61L9/044 (EP,US);
A61L9/01 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/09] | Title | German: | Zusammensetzung zur Luftverbesserung | [2001/09] | English: | Air freshening composition | [2001/09] | French: | Composition pour le rafraîchissement de l'air | [2001/09] | Examination procedure | 18.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/38] | 21.01.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 13.05.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.04.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.07.2005 | BE | 20.07.2005 | CH | 20.07.2005 | FI | 20.07.2005 | LI | 20.07.2005 | NL | 20.07.2005 | CY | 21.08.2005 | LU | 21.08.2005 | IE | 22.08.2005 | MC | 31.08.2005 | DK | 20.10.2005 | GR | 20.10.2005 | SE | 20.10.2005 | PT | 21.12.2005 | [2007/26] |
Former [2007/20] | AT | 20.07.2005 | |
BE | 20.07.2005 | ||
CH | 20.07.2005 | ||
FI | 20.07.2005 | ||
LI | 20.07.2005 | ||
NL | 20.07.2005 | ||
CY | 21.08.2005 | ||
IE | 22.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
LU | 20.09.2005 | ||
DK | 20.10.2005 | ||
GR | 20.10.2005 | ||
SE | 20.10.2005 | ||
PT | 21.12.2005 | ||
Former [2007/08] | AT | 20.07.2005 | |
BE | 20.07.2005 | ||
CH | 20.07.2005 | ||
FI | 20.07.2005 | ||
LI | 20.07.2005 | ||
NL | 20.07.2005 | ||
IE | 22.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
LU | 20.09.2005 | ||
DK | 20.10.2005 | ||
GR | 20.10.2005 | ||
SE | 20.10.2005 | ||
PT | 21.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/40] | AT | 20.07.2005 | |
BE | 20.07.2005 | ||
CH | 20.07.2005 | ||
FI | 20.07.2005 | ||
LI | 20.07.2005 | ||
NL | 20.07.2005 | ||
IE | 22.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
DK | 20.10.2005 | ||
GR | 20.10.2005 | ||
SE | 20.10.2005 | ||
PT | 21.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/28] | AT | 20.07.2005 | |
BE | 20.07.2005 | ||
CH | 20.07.2005 | ||
FI | 20.07.2005 | ||
LI | 20.07.2005 | ||
NL | 20.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
DK | 20.10.2005 | ||
GR | 20.10.2005 | ||
SE | 20.10.2005 | ||
PT | 21.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/26] | AT | 20.07.2005 | |
BE | 20.07.2005 | ||
CH | 20.07.2005 | ||
FI | 20.07.2005 | ||
LI | 20.07.2005 | ||
NL | 20.07.2005 | ||
DK | 20.10.2005 | ||
GR | 20.10.2005 | ||
SE | 20.10.2005 | ||
PT | 21.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 20.07.2005 | |
BE | 20.07.2005 | ||
CH | 20.07.2005 | ||
FI | 20.07.2005 | ||
LI | 20.07.2005 | ||
NL | 20.07.2005 | ||
GR | 20.10.2005 | ||
SE | 20.10.2005 | ||
PT | 21.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 20.07.2005 | |
CH | 20.07.2005 | ||
FI | 20.07.2005 | ||
LI | 20.07.2005 | ||
NL | 20.07.2005 | ||
GR | 20.10.2005 | ||
SE | 20.10.2005 | ||
PT | 21.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 20.07.2005 | |
FI | 20.07.2005 | ||
SE | 20.10.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US4663081 (GRIMSHAW BRYAN [GB], et al) [DA] 1-12 * table 1 * * claim - *; | [X]EP0520547 (SARA LEE DE NV [NL]) [X] 1,4-12 * example . * * column 3, line 18 - line 21 * * claim - *; | JPH08113522 [ ] (EARTH CHEMICAL CO); | [X]EP0864637 (BUCK CHEMIE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,3-9,12 * examples II.1,II.2; tables 1A,1B * * claim - *; | [X] - TSUNODA YASUO ET AL, "Aqueous perfume compositions for heat-vaporization", CAPLUS, American cChemical Society, (1996), XP002155026 [X] 1,2,4-9,12 * abstract * |