EP1079048 - Key barrel drive arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.05.2002 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.07.2002 [2002/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Meritor Light Vehicle Systems (UK) Ltd Fordhouse Lane, Stirchley Birmingham B30 3BW / GB | [2001/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Spurr, Nigel Victor Meritor Light Vehicle Sys. UK Ltd., Fordhouse Lane Stirchley, Birmingham B30 3BW / GB | 02 /
Powell, Andrew Meritor Light Vehicle Sys. (UK)Ltd, Fordhouse Lane Stirchley, Birmingham, B30 3BW / GB | 03 /
Fisher, Sydney Edward Meritor Light Vehicle Sys. (UK)Ltd, Fordhouse Lane Stirchley, Birmingham, B30 3BW / GB | [2001/09] | Representative(s) | Jones, John Bryn, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/09] | Jones, John Bryn, et al Withers & Rogers, Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 00307157.8 | 21.08.2000 | [2001/09] | Priority number, date | GB19990020059 | 24.08.1999 Original published format: GB 9920059 | [2001/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1079048 | Date: | 28.02.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | E05B17/04 | [2001/09] | CPC: |
E05B17/04 (EP);
E05B79/20 (EP);
E05B85/06 (EP);
E05B17/041 (EP);
E05B85/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2001/46] |
Former [2001/09] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Antriebsvorrichtung für einen Schliesszylinder | [2001/09] | English: | Key barrel drive arrangement | [2001/09] | French: | Dispositif d'entraînement pour un barillet de serrure | [2001/09] | Examination procedure | 29.08.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/27] | 27.12.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2002/27] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 02.10.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.10.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.10.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 02.10.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 02.10.2001 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.10.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 02.10.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 02.10.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 02.10.2001 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 02.10.2001 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 02.10.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 02.10.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.10.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.10.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 02.10.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 02.10.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 02.10.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.10.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 02.10.2001 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US1724424 (SANDHOLDT JR JOHN) [X] 1-3,15,19 * the whole document *; | [X]US2548242 (ROSENBARGER CLIFFORD W) [X] 1,15,19 * the whole document *; | [A]GB1579840 (BOWDEN CONTROLS LTD) [A] 5-9* the whole document *; | [A]JPH07269203 (OHI SEISAKUSHO CO LTD) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [XAY]EP0692595 (ROVER GROUP [GB]) [X] 1-4,6,7,15,19 * the whole document * [A] 8 [Y] 9-14; | [XAY]DE19728967 (BROSE FAHRZEUGTEILE [DE]) [X] 1,15,19,20 * column 5, line 17 - line 33 * * the whole document * [A] 15,16 [Y] 9-14 |