EP1078593 - Automatic wet towel supplying apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.12.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jung, Nak-Won Apt. No. 308-1402, Hangaram Apt., 1586 Kwanyang-Dong, Dongan-Ku Anyang-City Kyungki-Do / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/09] | For all designated states Jung, Nak-Won Apt. No. 308-1402, Hangaram Apt., 1586 Kwanyang-Dong, Dongan-Ku Anyang-City, Kyungki-Do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2001/09] | Representative(s) | Watkin, Timothy Lawrence Harvey Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/09] | Watkin, Timothy Lawrence Harvey Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co., Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London, WC1A 1LW / GB | Application number, filing date | 00307244.4 | 22.08.2000 | [2001/09] | Priority number, date | KR19990035708 | 26.08.1999 Original published format: KR 9935708 | KR19990056272 | 09.12.1999 Original published format: KR 9956272 | [2001/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1078593 | Date: | 28.02.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1078593 | Date: | 26.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A47K10/26 | [2001/09] | CPC: |
A47K10/26 (EP,US);
A47K2010/328 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/09] | Title | German: | Automatischer Spender für feuchte Handtücher | [2001/09] | English: | Automatic wet towel supplying apparatus | [2001/09] | French: | Distributeur automatique pour serviettes humidifiées | [2001/09] | Examination procedure | 26.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/26] | 24.05.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.11.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 29.11.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2002 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   12.09.2002 | 31.08.2003 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   03.02.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.01.2005 | BE | 26.01.2005 | CH | 26.01.2005 | FI | 26.01.2005 | FR | 26.01.2005 | IT | 26.01.2005 | LI | 26.01.2005 | NL | 26.01.2005 | DK | 26.04.2005 | GR | 26.04.2005 | SE | 26.04.2005 | DE | 27.04.2005 | ES | 07.05.2005 | PT | 26.06.2005 | CY | 22.08.2005 | IE | 22.08.2005 | LU | 22.08.2005 | MC | 31.08.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/35] | AT | 26.01.2005 | |
BE | 26.01.2005 | ||
CH | 26.01.2005 | ||
FI | 26.01.2005 | ||
FR | 26.01.2005 | ||
IT | 26.01.2005 | ||
LI | 26.01.2005 | ||
NL | 26.01.2005 | ||
DK | 26.04.2005 | ||
GR | 26.04.2005 | ||
SE | 26.04.2005 | ||
DE | 27.04.2005 | ||
ES | 07.05.2005 | ||
CY | 22.08.2005 | ||
IE | 22.08.2005 | ||
LU | 22.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
Former [2007/26] | AT | 26.01.2005 | |
BE | 26.01.2005 | ||
CH | 26.01.2005 | ||
FI | 26.01.2005 | ||
FR | 26.01.2005 | ||
LI | 26.01.2005 | ||
NL | 26.01.2005 | ||
DK | 26.04.2005 | ||
GR | 26.04.2005 | ||
SE | 26.04.2005 | ||
DE | 27.04.2005 | ||
ES | 07.05.2005 | ||
CY | 22.08.2005 | ||
IE | 22.08.2005 | ||
LU | 22.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | AT | 26.01.2005 | |
BE | 26.01.2005 | ||
CH | 26.01.2005 | ||
FI | 26.01.2005 | ||
FR | 26.01.2005 | ||
LI | 26.01.2005 | ||
NL | 26.01.2005 | ||
DK | 26.04.2005 | ||
GR | 26.04.2005 | ||
SE | 26.04.2005 | ||
DE | 27.04.2005 | ||
ES | 07.05.2005 | ||
CY | 22.08.2005 | ||
IE | 22.08.2005 | ||
LU | 31.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
Former [2007/08] | AT | 26.01.2005 | |
BE | 26.01.2005 | ||
CH | 26.01.2005 | ||
FI | 26.01.2005 | ||
FR | 26.01.2005 | ||
LI | 26.01.2005 | ||
NL | 26.01.2005 | ||
DK | 26.04.2005 | ||
GR | 26.04.2005 | ||
SE | 26.04.2005 | ||
DE | 27.04.2005 | ||
ES | 07.05.2005 | ||
IE | 22.08.2005 | ||
LU | 31.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
Former [2006/40] | AT | 26.01.2005 | |
BE | 26.01.2005 | ||
CH | 26.01.2005 | ||
FI | 26.01.2005 | ||
FR | 26.01.2005 | ||
LI | 26.01.2005 | ||
NL | 26.01.2005 | ||
DK | 26.04.2005 | ||
GR | 26.04.2005 | ||
SE | 26.04.2005 | ||
DE | 27.04.2005 | ||
ES | 07.05.2005 | ||
IE | 22.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
Former [2006/32] | AT | 26.01.2005 | |
BE | 26.01.2005 | ||
CH | 26.01.2005 | ||
FI | 26.01.2005 | ||
FR | 26.01.2005 | ||
LI | 26.01.2005 | ||
NL | 26.01.2005 | ||
DK | 26.04.2005 | ||
GR | 26.04.2005 | ||
SE | 26.04.2005 | ||
DE | 27.04.2005 | ||
ES | 07.05.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
Former [2006/28] | AT | 26.01.2005 | |
BE | 26.01.2005 | ||
CH | 26.01.2005 | ||
FI | 26.01.2005 | ||
LI | 26.01.2005 | ||
NL | 26.01.2005 | ||
DK | 26.04.2005 | ||
GR | 26.04.2005 | ||
SE | 26.04.2005 | ||
DE | 27.04.2005 | ||
ES | 07.05.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | AT | 26.01.2005 | |
BE | 26.01.2005 | ||
CH | 26.01.2005 | ||
FI | 26.01.2005 | ||
LI | 26.01.2005 | ||
NL | 26.01.2005 | ||
DK | 26.04.2005 | ||
GR | 26.04.2005 | ||
SE | 26.04.2005 | ||
DE | 27.04.2005 | ||
ES | 07.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/18] | AT | 26.01.2005 | |
BE | 26.01.2005 | ||
CH | 26.01.2005 | ||
FI | 26.01.2005 | ||
LI | 26.01.2005 | ||
DK | 26.04.2005 | ||
GR | 26.04.2005 | ||
SE | 26.04.2005 | ||
DE | 27.04.2005 | ||
ES | 07.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 26.01.2005 | |
BE | 26.01.2005 | ||
CH | 26.01.2005 | ||
FI | 26.01.2005 | ||
LI | 26.01.2005 | ||
DK | 26.04.2005 | ||
GR | 26.04.2005 | ||
SE | 26.04.2005 | ||
ES | 07.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | AT | 26.01.2005 | |
BE | 26.01.2005 | ||
CH | 26.01.2005 | ||
FI | 26.01.2005 | ||
LI | 26.01.2005 | ||
DK | 26.04.2005 | ||
SE | 26.04.2005 | ||
ES | 07.05.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 26.01.2005 | |
BE | 26.01.2005 | ||
FI | 26.01.2005 | ||
SE | 26.04.2005 | ||
Former [2005/48] | FI | 26.01.2005 | |
SE | 26.04.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 26.01.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE29719737U (CHANG LIANG MIN [TW]) [A] 1,7* the whole document *; | [AD]US5829278 (KOO JA YOON [KR]) [AD] 1,2 * column W * |