Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2001099655 | Global Dossier | 13.04.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | JP27761799 | 29.09.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2001074470 | Global Dossier | 23.03.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | JP25496399 | 08.09.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100413875B | Global Dossier | 13.01.2004 | B1 | KR20010050366 | 15.06.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | JP27761799 | 29.09.1999 | JP25496399 | 08.09.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1083404 | Global Dossier | 30.01.2008 | B1 | EP1083404 | 13.08.2003 | A3 | EP1083404 | 14.03.2001 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP27761799 | 29.09.1999 | JP25496399 | 08.09.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60037928T | 22.01.2009 | T2 | DE60037928D1 | 20.03.2008 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP27761799 | 29.09.1999 | JP25496399 | 08.09.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6497148 | 24.12.2002 | B1 | Priority number | Date | JP27761799 | 29.09.1999 | JP25496399 | 08.09.1999 |