EP1081869 - Methods and apparatus for representation of branch metrics in a communication system decoder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.10.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.09.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 18.10.2017 [2017/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lucent Technologies Inc. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US | [2015/50] |
Former [2013/24] | For all designated states Lucent Technologies Inc. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US | ||
Former [2013/13] | For all designated states Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc. 600-700 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974 / US | ||
Former [2009/36] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill NJ 07974-0636 / US | ||
Former [2001/10] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lou, Hui-Ling 41 Ethan Drive Apt. 1A Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974 / US | 02 /
Urbanke, Rudiger L. 41 Ethan Drive Apt 1A Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974 / US | [2015/50] |
Former [2001/10] | 01 /
Lou, Hui-Ling 41 Ethan Drive, Apt. 1A Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974 / US | ||
02 /
Urbanke, Rudiger L. 41 Ethan Drive, Apt 1A Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974 / US | Representative(s) | Dilg, Haeusler, Schindelmann Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Leonrodstraße 58 80636 München / DE | [2014/44] |
Former [2001/20] | Williams, David John, et al Page White & Farrer, 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | ||
Former [2001/10] | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk, et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB | Application number, filing date | 00307366.5 | 29.08.2000 | [2001/10] | Priority number, date | US19990390386 | 03.09.1999 Original published format: US 390386 | [2001/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1081869 | Date: | 07.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1081869 | Date: | 19.11.2003 | [2003/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1081869 | Date: | 09.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H03M13/41 | [2001/10] | CPC: |
H03M13/6325 (EP,US);
H03M13/256 (EP,US);
H03M13/3961 (EP,US);
H03M13/41 (EP,US);
H03M13/4107 (EP,US);
H03M13/6502 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2015/50] |
Former [2004/33] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2001/10] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Ausführung zur Vorstellung von Zweigmetriken in einem Kommunikationssystemdekoder | [2001/10] | English: | Methods and apparatus for representation of branch metrics in a communication system decoder | [2001/10] | French: | Méthode et appareil pour représenter des métriques de branches dans un décodeur de système de communication | [2001/10] | Examination procedure | 14.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/29] | 01.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.06.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 25.06.2010 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 13.05.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.09.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 02.09.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.09.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Appeal following examination | 25.08.2010 | Appeal received No. T2318/10 | 05.11.2010 | Statement of grounds filed | 11.12.2014 | Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant | 11.12.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.12.2014 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.06.2005 | Opposition(s) | 12.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 25.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2012 | 13   M06   Fee paid on   13.11.2012 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 29.08.2016 | FR | 31.08.2016 | [2017/42] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0653715 (AT & T CORP [US]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0800279 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1-20* the whole document *; | [XY] - LOU H-L, "IMPLEMENTING THE VITERBI ALGORITHM. FUNDAMENTALS AND REAL-TIME ISSUES FOR PROCESSORS DESIGNERS", IEEE SIGNAL PROCESSING MAGAZINE, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (19950901), vol. 12, no. 5, ISSN 1053-5888, pages 42 - 52, XP000651033 [X] 1,10-12 * page 44 - page 45 * [Y] 2-9,13-20 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/79.410439 | [XY] - BIGLIERI E ET AL, "Chapter 3: TCM Combined Modulation and Coding", INTRODUCTION TO TRELLIS CODED MODULATION WITH APPLICATIONS, NEW YORK, MACMILLAN, US, (1991), pages 67 - 98, XP002254740 [X] 1,10-12 * the whole document * [Y] 2-9,13-20 |