EP1124328 - A method of fabricating a zinc oxide based resonator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 26.03.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/33] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kowach, Glen Robert 26 Paterson Road Fanwood, New Jersey 07023 / US | [2001/33] | Representative(s) | Williams, David John, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/33] | Williams, David John, et al Page White & Farrer, 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 00307404.4 | 29.08.2000 | [2001/33] | Priority number, date | US20000501403 | 10.02.2000 Original published format: US 501403 | [2001/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1124328 | Date: | 16.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H03H9/02, H03H3/08 | [2001/33] | CPC: |
H03H9/175 (EP);
H03H3/02 (KR);
H03H3/04 (EP);
H03H3/10 (EP);
H03H9/02094 (EP);
H03H9/02574 (EP);
H10N30/05 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2002/19] |
Former [2001/33] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Herstellungsverfahren eines auf Zinkoxid basierten Resonators | [2001/33] | English: | A method of fabricating a zinc oxide based resonator | [2001/33] | French: | Méthode de fabrication d'un résonateur basé sur oxide de zinc | [2001/33] | Examination procedure | 29.08.2000 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 07.09.2000 | Examination requested [2001/33] | 30.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.04.2001 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 23.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2004/20] | 01.03.2004 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2004/20] | Appeal following examination | 25.07.2003 | Appeal received No. T1052/03 | 16.02.2004 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant inadmissible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US4447754 (WAGERS ROBERT S [US]); | [A]EP0534355 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]); | [A]US5654044 (MORAN MARK B [US], et al) |