EP1081040 - Pedestal mount for an outboard motor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 20.08.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2004 | Refusal of application | published on 06.10.2004 [2004/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BRUNSWICK CORPORATION One North Field Court Lake Forest, Illinois 60045 / US | [2001/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Alby, Jeremy L. 2393 Witzel Avenue Oshkosh, WI 54904 / US | 02 /
Gunderson, Martin E.Olson c/oBrunswick corporation 1 North Field Court, Lake Forest Illinois 60045 / US | 03 /
Uppgard, Darin C. N749 Spring Lake Estates Road Neshkoro, Wisconsin 54960 / US | [2001/25] |
Former [2001/10] | 01 /
Alby, Jeremy L. 2393 Witzel Avenue Oshkosh, WI 54904 / US | ||
02 /
Gunderson, Martin E. Olson 3176 E. Ottertail Court Green Bay, Wisconsin 54311 / US | |||
03 /
Uppgard, Darin C. N749 Spring Lake Estates Road Neshkoro, Wisconsin 54960 / US | Representative(s) | Burke, Steven David, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/10] | Burke, Steven David, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 00307460.6 | 30.08.2000 | [2001/10] | Priority number, date | US19990385761 | 30.08.1999 Original published format: US 385761 | [2001/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1081040 | Date: | 07.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1081040 | Date: | 04.12.2002 | [2002/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B63H20/08 | [2001/10] | CPC: |
B63H20/08 (EP,US);
B63H20/10 (EP,US);
B63H20/106 (EP,US);
B63H2020/003 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2003/35] |
Former [2001/10] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Besfestigungssockel für einen Aussenbordmotor | [2001/10] | English: | Pedestal mount for an outboard motor | [2001/10] | French: | Support à piédestal pour un moteur hors bord | [2001/10] | Examination procedure | 06.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/15] | 20.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.06.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 12.01.2004 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2004/41] | 12.01.2004 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.05.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2004/41] | 06.05.2004 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 10.07.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2003 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4119054 (PICHL HEINZ) [X] 1-7,11-15,18,19 * abstract * * column 3, line 11 - column 6, line 5 * [Y] 8-10,16,17,20; | [X]US4563155 (BLANCHARD CLARENCE E [US]) [X] 1-20 * abstract *; | [XY]US3269351 (SHIMANCKAS WILLIAM J) [X] 1-8,11-20 * abstract * * column 2, line 26 - column 4, line 40 * [Y] 9,10; | [Y]US4232627 (GLENN RONNIE D, et al) [Y] 8-10,16,17,20 * abstract *; | [Y]US5782662 (ICENOGLE ROBERT O [US]) [Y] 8-10,16,17,20 * abstract *; | [A]US5755604 (BORGERSEN KJELL [SE]) [A] 1,13,20 * abstract * * column 1, lines 15-45 * * column 2, line 30 - column 3, line 24 *; | [A]US4403969 (PICHL HEINZ [SE]) [A] 1,13,20 * abstract *; | [A]US4406634 (BLANCHARD CLARENCE E [US]) [A] 1,13,20 * abstract * | by applicant | US3911853 | US4354847 | US4355986 | US4363629 | US4384856 | US4395238 | US4406634 | US4449945 | US4545770 | US5154651 |