EP1127525 - Electric toaster [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.05.2005 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Simatelex Manufactory Company Limited 9th Floor, Chai Wan Industrial Centre, 20 Lee Chung Street Chai Wan Hong Kong / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2001/35] | For all designated states Simatelex Manufactory Company Limited 9th Floor, Chai Wan Industrial Centre, 20 Lee Chung Street Chai Wan, Hong Kong / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chan, Chi Tong, c/o Simatelex Manufactury Co., Ltd 9th fl., Chai Wan Ind.Centre, 20 Lee Chung Street Chai Wan, Hong Kong / CN | 02 /
Yeh, Chun Ying, c/o Simatelex Manufactury Co., Ltd 9th fl., Chai Wan Ind.Centre, 20 Lee Chung Street Chai Wan, Hong Kong / CN | [2001/35] | Representative(s) | Godwin, Edgar James, et al Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/35] | Godwin, Edgar James, et al MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 00307492.9 | 31.08.2000 | [2001/35] | Priority number, date | US20000496256 | 01.02.2000 Original published format: US 496256 | [2001/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1127525 | Date: | 29.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1127525 | Date: | 12.09.2001 | [2001/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1127525 | Date: | 07.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A47J37/08 | [2001/35] | CPC: |
A47J37/0814 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2004/28] |
Former [2001/35] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Elektrischer Toaster | [2001/35] | English: | Electric toaster | [2001/35] | French: | Grille-pain électrique | [2001/35] | Examination procedure | 26.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/19] | 12.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.09.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 02.09.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.07.2004 | BE | 07.07.2004 | CH | 07.07.2004 | CY | 07.07.2004 | FI | 07.07.2004 | LI | 07.07.2004 | NL | 07.07.2004 | IE | 31.08.2004 | LU | 31.08.2004 | MC | 31.08.2004 | DK | 07.10.2004 | GR | 07.10.2004 | SE | 07.10.2004 | ES | 18.10.2004 | PT | 07.12.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/08] | AT | 07.07.2004 | |
BE | 07.07.2004 | ||
CH | 07.07.2004 | ||
CY | 07.07.2004 | ||
FI | 07.07.2004 | ||
LI | 07.07.2004 | ||
NL | 07.07.2004 | ||
IE | 31.08.2004 | ||
LU | 31.08.2004 | ||
MC | 31.08.2004 | ||
DK | 07.10.2004 | ||
GR | 07.10.2004 | ||
SE | 07.10.2004 | ||
ES | 18.10.2004 | ||
Former [2006/47] | AT | 07.07.2004 | |
BE | 07.07.2004 | ||
CH | 07.07.2004 | ||
FI | 07.07.2004 | ||
LI | 07.07.2004 | ||
NL | 07.07.2004 | ||
IE | 31.08.2004 | ||
MC | 31.08.2004 | ||
DK | 07.10.2004 | ||
GR | 07.10.2004 | ||
SE | 07.10.2004 | ||
ES | 18.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 07.07.2004 | |
BE | 07.07.2004 | ||
CH | 07.07.2004 | ||
FI | 07.07.2004 | ||
LI | 07.07.2004 | ||
IE | 31.08.2004 | ||
MC | 31.08.2004 | ||
DK | 07.10.2004 | ||
GR | 07.10.2004 | ||
SE | 07.10.2004 | ||
ES | 18.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/28] | AT | 07.07.2004 | |
BE | 07.07.2004 | ||
CH | 07.07.2004 | ||
FI | 07.07.2004 | ||
LI | 07.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.08.2004 | ||
DK | 07.10.2004 | ||
GR | 07.10.2004 | ||
SE | 07.10.2004 | ||
ES | 18.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 07.07.2004 | |
CH | 07.07.2004 | ||
FI | 07.07.2004 | ||
LI | 07.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.08.2004 | ||
DK | 07.10.2004 | ||
GR | 07.10.2004 | ||
SE | 07.10.2004 | ||
ES | 18.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | AT | 07.07.2004 | |
CH | 07.07.2004 | ||
FI | 07.07.2004 | ||
LI | 07.07.2004 | ||
DK | 07.10.2004 | ||
GR | 07.10.2004 | ||
SE | 07.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/21] | AT | 07.07.2004 | |
CH | 07.07.2004 | ||
FI | 07.07.2004 | ||
LI | 07.07.2004 | ||
GR | 07.10.2004 | ||
SE | 07.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 07.07.2004 | |
FI | 07.07.2004 | ||
GR | 07.10.2004 | ||
SE | 07.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/13] | AT | 07.07.2004 | |
FI | 07.07.2004 | ||
SE | 07.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 07.07.2004 | |
SE | 07.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/10] | SE | 07.10.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1573011 (HOTPOINT LTD) [X] 1 * figure - * * page 2, line 93 - page 3, line 127 * * page 4, line 61 - line 92 *; | [X]DE3020778 (RAWE ELECTRONIK GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2 * figure .; claim - * * page 11, paragraph L - page 12, paragraph L *; | [A]US5304782 (MCNAIR JOHN D [AU], et al) [A] 1 * figure 4 ** column 5, line 3 - column 6, line 45 * |