blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1080889

EP1080889 - Method and apparatus fpr controlling pressure applied to printing material [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.01.2010
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip04.03.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 06.04.2011  [2011/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fuji Machine Mfg. Co., Ltd.
19, Chausuyama, Yama-machi Chiryu-shi
Aichi-ken / JP
[2009/09]
Former [2001/10]For all designated states
Fuji Machine Mfg. Co., Ltd.
19, Chausuyama, Yama-machi
Chiryu-shi, Aichi-ken / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Isogai, Takeyoshi, Fuji Machine MFG. Co., Ltd.
19, Chausuyama, Yama-machi
Chiryu-shi, Aichi-ken / JP
02 / Adachi, Jun, Fuji Machine MFG. Co., Ltd.
19, Chausuyama, Yama-machi
Chiryu-shi, Aichi-ken / JP
03 / Saito, Tatsumi, Fuji Machine MFG. Co., Ltd.
19, Chausuyama, Yama-machi
Chiryu-shi, Aichi-ken / JP
04 / Mizuno, Manabu, Fuji Machine MFG. Co., Ltd.
19, Chausuyama, Yama-machi
Chiryu-shi, Aichi-ken / JP
 [2001/10]
Representative(s)Murray, Elisabeth Anne, et al
Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London
EC1N 2SQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2006/33]Murray, Elisabeth Anne, et al
Mathys & Squire 120 Holborn
London EC1N 2SQ / GB
Former [2001/10]Moir, Michael Christopher, et al
Mathys & Squire 100 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8AL / GB
Application number, filing date00307638.704.09.2000
[2001/10]
Priority number, dateJP1999025163406.09.1999         Original published format: JP 25163499
[2001/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1080889
Date:07.03.2001
Language:EN
[2001/10]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1080889
Date:06.02.2002
[2002/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1080889
Date:25.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.12.2001
ClassificationIPC:B41F15/42, H05K3/12
[2001/10]
CPC:
B41F15/42 (EP,US); B41M1/12 (US); H05K3/1233 (EP,US);
H05K1/0269 (EP,US); H05K2203/0139 (EP,US); H05K2203/163 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2002/43]
Former [2001/10]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Methode und Vorrichtung zur Regelung des auf Druckmaterial ausgeübten Pressdrucks[2001/10]
English:Method and apparatus fpr controlling pressure applied to printing material[2001/10]
French:Méthode et dispositif de réglage de la pression exercée sur materiaux d'impression[2001/10]
Examination procedure09.01.2002Examination requested  [2002/12]
02.02.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.06.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.06.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
22.08.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.05.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M09)
29.01.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.02.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.05.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.09.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.01.2009Fee for grant paid
05.01.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
29.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
17.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
21.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
01.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
30.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
28.08.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
FR30.09.2009
[2011/14]
Former [2010/35]NL25.02.2009
FR30.09.2009
Former [2009/34]NL25.02.2009
Documents cited:Search[DA]JPH0848024  ;
 [A]US4622239  (SCHOENTHALER DAVID [US], et al) [A] 1,8,13,16,17,20* the whole document *;
 [A]US4636406  (LEICHT JOHN L [US]) [A] 1,8,13,16,17,20 * the whole document *
 [DA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960628), vol. 1996, no. 06, & JP08048024 A 19960220 (FUJI MACH MFG CO LTD) [DA] 1,8,13,16,17,20 * abstract *
ExaminationUS4023487
 US4817524
by applicantUS4023487
 US4817524
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.