EP1085650 - Method for detecting synchronous motor rotor magnetic pole position [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.01.2008 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FANUC LTD 3580, Shibokusa, Aza-komanba, Oshino-mura Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-0597 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/09] | For all designated states FANUC LTD 3580, Shibokusa, Aza-komanba, Oshino-mura Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-0597 / JP | ||
Former [2004/23] | For all designated states FANUC LTD 3580, Shibokusa, Aza-komanba, Oshino-mura Minamitsuru-gun, Yamanashi 401-0597 / JP | ||
Former [2001/12] | For all designated states Fanuc Ltd 3580, Shibokusa Aza-Komanba, Oshino-mura Minamitsuru-gun, Yamanashi 401-0597 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Toyozawa, Yukio 2052-19, Toyooka, Koushi-machi Kituchi-gun, Kunamoto 861-1115 / JP | 02 /
Sonoda, Naoto 3326-2, Shimorokka, Kashima-machi Kamimashiki-gun, Kumamoto 861-3102 / JP | [2001/12] | Representative(s) | Billington, Lawrence Emlyn Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/12] | Billington, Lawrence Emlyn Haseltine Lake & Co. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 00307645.2 | 05.09.2000 | [2001/12] | Priority number, date | JP19990252662 | 07.09.1999 Original published format: JP 25266299 | [2001/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1085650 | Date: | 21.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1085650 | Date: | 02.05.2003 | [2003/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1085650 | Date: | 28.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H02P6/20 | [2003/17] | CPC: |
H02P6/18 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/12] | H02P6/18 | Designated contracting states | DE [2004/04] |
Former [2001/12] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Ermitteln der Position des magnetischen Pols des Rotors eines Synchronmotors | [2001/12] | English: | Method for detecting synchronous motor rotor magnetic pole position | [2001/12] | French: | Méthode pour détecter la position du pole magnétique du rotor d'un motor synchrone | [2001/12] | Examination procedure | 08.10.2003 | Examination requested [2003/50] | 06.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 15.01.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0571076 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-6 * abstract *; | [X]EP0708521 (AGIE AG IND ELEKTRONIK [CH]) [X] 1,3,5,6 * abstract * * page 6, line 1 - page 9, line 50; figures 1-4 *; | [A]WO9620528 (HYDRO QUEBEC [CA]) [A] 1-6 * abstract ** page 7, line 18 - page 19, line 3; figures 1-4 *; | [X]US5874821 (MONLEONE RICCARDO [CH]) [X] 1-6 * abstract * * column 1, line 52 - column 2, line 38; figures 2-4 * * column 3, line 28 - column 5, line 10 * * column 6, line 13 - column 6, line 31 * * column 7, line 4 - column 7, line 6 * * column 7, line 44 - column 10, line 16 * |