EP1083613 - Conductive organic compound having a pi-electron resonance structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.06.2007 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2007 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.07.2007 [2007/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/11] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Okada, Shinjiro Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Nishida, Naoya Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Tsuboyama, Akira Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Moriyama, Takashi Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2001/11] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/11] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. High Holborn 2-5 Warwick Court London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 00307698.1 | 07.09.2000 | [2001/11] | Priority number, date | JP19990255007 | 09.09.1999 Original published format: JP 25500799 | JP19990273878 | 28.09.1999 Original published format: JP 27387899 | [2001/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1083613 | Date: | 14.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1083613 | Date: | 05.04.2006 | [2006/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01L51/20 | [2001/11] | CPC: |
H10K85/622 (EP,US);
H10K50/11 (EP,US);
H10K85/731 (EP,US);
C09K2323/00 (EP,US);
C09K2323/04 (EP,US);
H10K85/311 (EP,US);
H10K85/611 (EP,US);
H10K85/623 (EP,US);
H10K85/631 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/11] | Title | German: | Leitende organische Verbindung mit einer pi-Elektronen-Resonanzstruktur | [2001/11] | English: | Conductive organic compound having a pi-electron resonance structure | [2001/11] | French: | Conducteur organique à structure de resonance d'electrons pi | [2001/11] | Examination procedure | 05.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/46] | 16.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.06.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5683833 (HAEUSSLING LUKAS [DE], et al); | [X]EP0847228 (TOYO INK MFG CO [JP]); | [X]US5858273 (ASAOKA MASANOBU [JP], et al); |