EP1083566 - Tape cartridge and mold for making the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.08.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.10.2003 [2003/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TDK Corporation 13-1, Nihonbashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8272 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/11] | For all designated states TDK Corporation 13-1, Nihonbashi 1-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo 103-8272 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Okamura, Masatoshi c/o TDK Corporation, 1-13-1, Nihonbashi, Chuo-ku Tokyo, 103-8272 / JP | 02 /
Kaneda, Hiroshi c/o TDK Corporation, 1-13-1, Nihonbashi, Chuo-ku Tokyo, 103-8272 / JP | [2001/11] | Representative(s) | Swindell & Pearson Limited 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/11] | Swindell & Pearson 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | Application number, filing date | 00307741.9 | 07.09.2000 | [2001/11] | Priority number, date | JP19990255431 | 09.09.1999 Original published format: JP 25543199 | [2001/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1083566 | Date: | 14.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1083566 | Date: | 09.05.2001 | [2001/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G11B23/107, G11B23/113 | [2001/11] | CPC: |
G11B23/113 (EP,US);
G11B23/107 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2002/05] |
Former [2001/11] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Bandkassette und Giessform zu ihrer Herstellung | [2001/11] | English: | Tape cartridge and mold for making the same | [2001/11] | French: | Cassette à bande et moule pour sa fabrication | [2001/11] | Examination procedure | 04.10.2001 | Examination requested [2001/48] | 10.11.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 05.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 01.04.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/41] | 07.05.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/41] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 19.12.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.12.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.12.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 19.12.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 19.12.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 19.12.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 19.12.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 19.12.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 19.12.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.12.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.12.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 19.12.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 19.12.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 19.12.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.12.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2002 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4977474 (OISHI KENGO [JP], et al) [A] 1-4 * abstract ** column 5, line 31 - line 41 *; | [A]WO9321634 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1-4 * abstract * * page 11, line 28 - page 12, line 14 *; | [A]US5927633 (MCALLISTER JEFFREY S [US]) [A] 1-4 * abstract * * column 5, line 54 - column 6, line 12 *; | [PXA]US5971310 (SALIBA GEORGE [US], et al) [PX] 1 * abstract * * column 5, line 3 - column 8, line 4 * [A] 2-4 |