Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
04.03.2011 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 06.04.2011 [2011/14] |
16.07.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 01.09.2004 [2004/36] |
07.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.06.2004 [2004/26] |
16.05.2003 | (Expected) grant | published on 02.07.2003 [2003/27] |
12.03.2003 | Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
20.11.2002 | Surcharge for renewal fee | |
20.11.2002 | Renewal fee | |
30.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
30.10.2002 | Surcharge for renewal fee | |
14.03.2002 | Change - extension states | |
16.11.2001 | Definitive list of designations | published on 02.01.2002 [2002/01] |
15.10.2001 | Amendment by applicant | |
23.02.2001 | Publication of search report | published on 11.04.2001 [2001/15] |
26.01.2001 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 14.03.2001 [2001/11] |
26.01.2001 | Request for examination filed | published on 14.03.2001 [2001/11] |