EP1083175 - Triazole derivatives having antifungal activity [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.05.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2011 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CY | published on 06.04.2011 [2011/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sankyo Company Limited 5-1, Nihonbashi-Honcho 3-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8426 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/11] | For all designated states Sankyo Company Limited 5-1, Nihonbashi-Honcho 3-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo 103-8426 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Konosu, Toshiyuki Sankyo Company Ltd., 2-58 Hiromachi 1-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 140-8710 / JP | 02 /
Oida, Sadao Sankyo Company Ltd., 2-58 Hiromachi 1-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 140-8710 / JP | 03 /
Mori, Makoto Sankyo Company Ltd., 2-58 Hiromachi 1-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 140-8710 / JP | 04 /
Uchida, Takuya Sankyo Company Ltd., 2-58 Hiromachi 1-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 140-8710 / JP | 05 /
Ohya, Satoshi Sankyo Company Ltd., 2-58 Hiromachi 1-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 140-8710 / JP | 06 /
Nakagawa, Akihiko Sankyo Company Ltd., 2-58 Hiromachi 1-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 140-8710 / JP | [2001/11] | Representative(s) | Gibson, Christian John Robert Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/11] | Gibson, Christian John Robert MARKS & CLERK, 57/60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 00307799.7 | 08.09.2000 | [2001/11] | Priority number, date | JP19990255702 | 09.09.1999 Original published format: JP 25570299 | JP20000103826 | 05.04.2000 Original published format: JP 2000103826 | [2001/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1083175 | Date: | 14.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1083175 | Date: | 11.04.2001 | [2001/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1083175 | Date: | 02.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C07D405/12, C07C255/56, A61K31/4196, A61P31/04 | [2001/11] | CPC: |
C07D231/12 (EP,US);
C07D405/10 (KR);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/10 (EP);
C07C255/56 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/11] | Title | German: | Triazolderivate mit antifungaler Wirkung | [2001/11] | English: | Triazole derivatives having antifungal activity | [2001/11] | French: | Dérivés de triazole à activité antifongique | [2001/11] | Examination procedure | 06.10.2000 | Examination requested [2001/11] | 11.10.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.11.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 28.02.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2002 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   08.11.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2011/14] |
Former [2004/36] | CY | 08.09.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]EP0841327 (SANKYO CO [JP]) [DY] 1-14 * claim - *; | [A]WO9833778 (SANKYO CO [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * claim - *; | [DY]WO9902524 (SANKYO CO [JP], et al) [DY] 1-14 * pages 93,98,105,108 and claims *; | [PY] - S. OIDA ET AL, "Synthesis and antifungal activities of R-102557 and related dioxane-triazole derivatives", CHEMICAL AND PHARMACEUTICAL BULLETIN., PHARMACEUTICAL SOCIETY OF JAPAN. TOKYO., JP, (200005), vol. 48, no. 5, ISSN 0009-2363, pages 694 - 707, XP002156630 [PY] 1-14 * the whole document * |