EP1085240 - Electromechanical brake system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.10.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR COMPANY LIMITED 2 Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/12] | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR COMPANY, LIMITED 2, Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tamasho, Tadashi 3-1-3-208 Tsujidonishikaigan Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa 251-0046 / JP | 02 /
Kubota, Masahiro 1-105, 1-9-2 Mutsuura, Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 236-0031 / JP | 03 /
Tsukamoto, Masahiro 2833-43-108 Totsuka-cho, Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken 244-0003 / JP | [2001/12] | Representative(s) | Godwin, Edgar James Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/12] | Godwin, Edgar James MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 00307959.7 | 14.09.2000 | [2001/12] | Priority number, date | JP19990260961 | 14.09.1999 Original published format: JP 26096199 | [2001/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1085240 | Date: | 21.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1085240 | Date: | 26.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F16H57/04, F16D65/16, B60T13/74, F16D55/226, F16D65/21 | [2003/25] | CPC: |
F16H57/0497 (EP,US);
B60T13/741 (EP,US);
F16D55/226 (EP,US);
F16D65/18 (EP,US);
F16D2066/005 (EP,US);
F16D2121/24 (EP,US);
F16D2125/40 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2001/12] | F16H57/04, F16D65/16, B60T13/74 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/50] |
Former [2001/12] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Elektromechanisches Bremssystem | [2001/12] | English: | Electromechanical brake system | [2001/12] | French: | Système de freinage électromécanique | [2001/12] | Examination procedure | 13.10.2000 | Examination requested [2001/12] | 13.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 29.09.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 26.11.2003 | [2006/14] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19804454 (ITT MFG ENTERPRISES INC [US]) [A] 1,2,12-14 * column 3, line 8 - column 4, line 66; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE19742988 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 2-7,12,14 * column 3, line 7 - line 53; figure 2 *; | [A]DE19615186 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 2-7,12,14 * column 2, line 38 - line 59 * * column 3, line 18 - column 4, line 14; figure 2 *; | [A]DE19807432 (DEUTSCH ZENTR LUFT & RAUMFAHRT [DE]) [A] 1,2,12-14 * column A; figures 2,3 *; | [PA]WO0029764 (SKF ENGINEERING & RESEARCH SER [NL], et al) [PA] 1,2,12-14 * page 3, line 12 - line 29; figure 1 *; | [PA]US5988335 (KUPFERSCHMID KENT A [US], et al) [PA] 1,2,12-14 * column A; figures 1,3 * | by applicant | JPH08284980 | JPH11260961 |