EP1085516 - Semiconductor storing apparatus and operation setting method of the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.10.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.2002 | Withdrawal of application | published on 11.12.2002 [2002/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/12] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Imura, Shigeru, c/o Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [2001/12] | Representative(s) | Nicholls, Michael John J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/12] | Nicholls, Michael John J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 00308053.8 | 15.09.2000 | [2001/12] | Priority number, date | JP19990265448 | 20.09.1999 Original published format: JP 26544899 | [2001/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1085516 | Date: | 21.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/12] | Classification | IPC: | G11C7/16 | [2001/12] | CPC: |
G11C7/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/12] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Halbleiterspeicherapparat und Verfahren zu seiner Verwendung | [2001/12] | English: | Semiconductor storing apparatus and operation setting method of the same | [2001/12] | French: | Appareil de mémorisation à semi-conducteur et méthode d' utilisation de ce dernier | [2001/12] | Examination procedure | 01.10.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/50] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |