EP1084821 - Heat resistant cushion material for forming press [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.03.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.04.2006 [2006/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ICHIKAWA CO., LTD. 14-15, Hongo 2-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/12] | For all designated states ICHIKAWA CO., LTD. 14-15, Hongo 2-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oda, Hiroyuki 3-14-302 Toyosumi, 1-chome Kashiwa-shi, Chiba-ken / JP | 02 /
Takamura, Hiroyuki 1360-8-B201 Tomobemachi-Sumiyoshi Nishi-Ibaragi-gun, Ibaragki-ken / JP | 03 /
Takakura, Yoshimasa 11-6 Takino, 1-chome, Motono-mura Inba-gun, Chiba-ken / JP | [2001/12] | Representative(s) | Meddle, Alan L. FORRESTER & BOEHMERT, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/12] | Meddle, Alan Leonard FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00308066.0 | 15.09.2000 | [2001/12] | Priority number, date | JP20000126627 | 26.04.2000 Original published format: JP 2000126627 | JP19990263179 | 17.09.1999 Original published format: JP 26317999 | [2001/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1084821 | Date: | 21.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1084821 | Date: | 02.01.2002 | [2002/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1084821 | Date: | 04.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B32B5/06, B32B3/26, B30B15/06, D04H1/00 | [2002/01] | CPC: |
B30B15/061 (EP);
B32B5/245 (KR);
B32B25/10 (US);
B32B27/12 (US);
B32B3/26 (EP);
B32B37/06 (KR);
B32B37/10 (KR);
B32B37/12 (KR);
B32B5/024 (US);
B32B5/06 (EP,US);
B32B2038/042 (KR);
B32B2250/24 (KR);
B32B2260/021 (KR);
B32B2260/046 (KR);
B32B2264/0207 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2001/12] | B32B5/06, B32B3/26, B30B15/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2002/38] |
Former [2001/12] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Hitzebeständiges Polstermaterial für Formpresse | [2001/12] | English: | Heat resistant cushion material for forming press | [2001/12] | French: | Matériau de rembourrage résistant à la chaleur pour presse de formage | [2001/12] | Examination procedure | 10.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/32] | 14.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.02.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH1058473 ; | [A]JPH05116161 ; | [A]JPH04361012 ; | [A]JPH0359157 ; | [X]US4461800 (TANAKA ATSUO [JP]) [X] 1,2,4 * claims 1,3,5-7,11 *; | [A]US4836871 (KATO NAOYUKI [JP]) [A] 1* claim 1 *; | [A]EP0582207 (ICHIKAWA CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * claims 1,3 *; | [A]EP0703069 (YAMAUCHI CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * claims 1,11,12,15 *; | [A]EP0718429 (ICHIKAWA CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1998, no. 19, Database accession no. 1998-211565, XP002180845 & JPH1058473 A 19980303 (ICHIKAWA KEORI KK) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1993, no. 24, Database accession no. 1993-191053, XP002180846 & JPH05116161 A 19930514 (ICHIKAWA KEORI KK) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1993, no. 04, Database accession no. 1993-032727, XP002180847 & JPH04361012 A 19921214 (ICHIKAWA KEORI KK) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1991, no. 17, Database accession no. 1991-120723, XP002180848 & JPH0359157 A 19910314 (ICHIKAWA KEORI KK) [A] 1 * abstract * |