blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1100009

EP1100009 - Liaison interface [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  01.06.2007
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip10.10.2008Change - representativepublished on 12.11.2008  [2008/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/20]For all designated states
LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Hernandez, Gaspar III
2 Greentree Drive
Andover, New Jersey 07821 / US
 [2001/20]
Representative(s)Sarup, David Alexander, et al
Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Ltd
Patent Business
c/o Nokia
125 Finsbury Pavement
London EC2A 1NQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/46]Sarup, David Alexander, et al
Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Limited Unit 18, Core 3, Workzone Innova Business Park Electric Avenue Enfield
EN3 7XU / GB
Former [2006/09]Sarup, David Alexander, et al
Lucent Technologie NS UK Limited 5 Mornington Road
Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB
Former [2001/39]Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, Dr., et al
Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road
Woodford Green Essex, IG8 0TU / GB
Former [2001/20]Williams, David John, et al
Page White & Farrer, 54 Doughty Street
London WC1N 2LS / GB
Application number, filing date00308079.318.09.2000
[2001/20]
Priority number, dateUS1999040787629.09.1999         Original published format: US 407876
[2001/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1100009
Date:16.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/20]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1100009
Date:28.07.2004
[2004/31]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.06.2004
ClassificationIPC:G06F9/44
[2001/20]
CPC:
G06F9/451 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/20]
TitleGerman:Liaisonschnittstelle[2001/20]
English:Liaison interface[2001/20]
French:Interface liaison[2001/20]
Examination procedure27.09.2004Examination requested  [2004/48]
14.02.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.06.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.11.2006Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 21.11.2006
02.11.2006Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
21.11.2006Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
18.01.2007Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2007/27]
30.01.2007Application refused, date of legal effect [2007/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
17.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
09.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
16.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
22.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0409588  (IBM [US]) [X] 1-14 * abstract * * column 1, line 42 - column 2, line 36 * * figures 1,2,6,7 * * column 3, line 1 - line 25 * * column 7, line 33 - line 43 * * column 11, line 14 - line 51 *;
 [X]US5627977  (HICKEY NEIL [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * abstract * * column 2, line 1 - line 22 * * column 2, line 63 - column 3, line 9 *;
 [A]US5831609  (LONDON MITCHELL B [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * column 1, line 45 - line 60 * * column 2, line 14 - line 60; figure 1 *;
 [X]US5956029  (OKADA YOSHIHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1-14 * abstract * * column 2, line 1 - line 45 * * column 3, line 60 - column 4, line 62; figures 1,9 *;
 [A]  - "SYSTEM FOR ACCESSING A MAINFRAME FROM A WORKSTATION USER INTERFACE", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, IBM CORP. NEW YORK, US, (19890901), vol. 32, no. 4A, ISSN 0018-8689, pages 290 - 291, XP000564030 [A] 1-14 * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.