EP1086844 - Road shape estimation apparatus and curve approach control apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.05.2008 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fuji Jukogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 7-2, Nishi-Shinjuku 1-Chome Shinjuku-Ku Tokyo-To / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/26] | For all designated states FUJI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 7-2, Nishi-Shinjuku 1-Chome Shinjuku-Ku Tokyo-To / JP | ||
Former [2001/13] | For all designated states FUJI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 7-2, Nishi-Shinjuku 1-Chome Shinjuku-Ku Tokyo-To / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matsuura, Munenori, c/o Sabaru Laboratory 9-6 Osawa 3-chome Mitaka-shi, Tokyo-to / JP | 02 /
Takahashi, Akira, c/o Subaru Laboratory 9-6 Osawa 3-chome Mitaka-shi, Tokyo-to / JP | [2001/13] | Representative(s) | WP Thompson 8th Floor 1 Mann Island Liverpool L3 1BP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/13] | W.P. Thompson & Co. Coopers Building, Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | Application number, filing date | 00308220.3 | 20.09.2000 | [2001/13] | Priority number, date | JP19990267734 | 21.09.1999 Original published format: JP 26773499 | [2001/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1086844 | Date: | 28.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1086844 | Date: | 12.05.2004 | [2004/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1086844 | Date: | 27.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B60K31/00, A01K27/00, G05D1/02 | [2004/20] | CPC: |
B60K31/0066 (EP,US);
B60W2552/20 (EP,US);
B60W2552/30 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2001/13] | B60K31/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2005/05] |
Former [2001/13] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Ermittlung einer Strassenkrümmung und zum Regeln der Geschwindigkeit bei Annäherung an eine Kurve | [2001/13] | English: | Road shape estimation apparatus and curve approach control apparatus | [2001/13] | French: | Dispositif pour estimer la courbure de la route et pour régler la phase d'entrée en virage | [2001/13] | Examination procedure | 19.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/43] | 13.11.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 09.03.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 11.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.01.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.05.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 16.05.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 20.12.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.12.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.12.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 20.12.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 20.12.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 20.12.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 20.12.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 20.12.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 20.12.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 20.12.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.12.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.12.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 20.12.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 20.12.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 20.12.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.12.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 27.09.2007 | [2009/03] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0789225 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * column 2, lines 16-25 * * column 4, line 43 - column 5, line 29 *; | [A]US5661650 (SEKINE HIROSHI [JP], et al) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]EP0890823 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * page 1, lines 18-43 * * page 4, lines 6-28 * * page 6, lines 8-12 * * figures 2,6 *; | [A]EP0901929 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [A] * the whole document * | by applicant | JPH0112528 | JPH04236699 | JPH082274 | JPH1183501 |