EP1096198 - Method and apparatus for remote lighting [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.08.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 10.09.2008 [2008/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Visteon Global Technologies, Inc. Suite 728 Parklane Towers East One Parklane Boulevard Dearborn Michigan 48126 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/18] | For all designated states Visteon Global Technologies, Inc. Suite 728, Parklane Towers East, One Parklane Boulevard Dearborn, Michigan 48126 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chinniah, Jeyachandrabose (Nmi) 3113 Fawnmeadow Ct. Ann Arbour, MI 48105 / US | 02 /
Patel, Balvantrai 3191 Hedgewood Ln Rochester Hills, MI 48309 / US | 03 /
Fallahi, Amir M. 6561 Stillwell W. Bloomfield, MI 48322 / US | [2001/18] | Representative(s) | Gemmell, Peter Alan, et al Dummett Copp LLP 25 The Square Martlesham Heath Ipswich IP5 3SL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/37] | Gemmell, Peter Alan, et al Dummett Copp 25 The Square Martlesham Heath Ipswich IP5 3SL Suffolk / GB | ||
Former [2001/18] | Gemmell, Peter Alan, Dr., et al Dummett Copp, 25 The Square, Martlesham Heath Ipswich, Suffolk IP5 3SL / GB | Application number, filing date | 00308273.2 | 21.09.2000 | [2001/18] | Priority number, date | US19990428253 | 27.10.1999 Original published format: US 428253 | [2001/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1096198 | Date: | 02.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F21V8/00, G02B26/02 | [2001/18] | CPC: |
G02B6/0005 (EP,US);
G02B6/3502 (EP,US);
G02B6/3564 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2002/04] |
Former [2001/18] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Einrichtung für Fern-Beleuchtung | [2001/18] | English: | Method and apparatus for remote lighting | [2001/18] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour éclairage à distance | [2001/18] | Examination procedure | 30.10.2001 | Examination requested [2002/01] | 03.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.04.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/41] | 12.05.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2004 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0595338 (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]) [X] 1-6 * abstract * [Y] 1; | [Y]DE4341234 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 1* abstract * |