EP1191121 - Radioactive medical implant and method of manufacturing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.05.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.05.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.07.2003 [2003/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Varian Medical Systems, Inc. 3100 Hansen Way Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | [2002/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Delfino, Michelangelo 670 San Antonio Road Los Altos, California 94022 / US | [2002/13] | Representative(s) | Beck, Simon Antony, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/13] | Beck, Simon Antony, et al Withers & Rogers, Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 00308414.2 | 26.09.2000 | [2002/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1191121 | Date: | 27.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C23C14/48 | [2002/13] | CPC: |
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C23C14/48 (EP);
A61N2005/1019 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2002/51] |
Former [2002/13] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Radioaktives medizinisches Implantat und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung | [2002/13] | English: | Radioactive medical implant and method of manufacturing | [2002/13] | French: | Implant médical radioactif et méthode pour sa fabrication | [2002/13] | Examination procedure | 30.09.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/27] | 29.01.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2003/27] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 11.11.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.11.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.11.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 11.11.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 11.11.2002 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.11.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 11.11.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 11.11.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 11.11.2002 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 11.11.2002 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 11.11.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 11.11.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.11.2002 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.11.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 11.11.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 11.11.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 11.11.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.11.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 11.11.2002 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2002 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US6060036 (ARMINI ANTHONY J [US]) [X] 1,4,5,30,44-47 * column 4, line 43 - column 5, line 35; figure 1; claims 1,2 * [A] 16,31,51; | [XA]WO0045892 (ADVANCED CARDIOVASCULAR SYSTEM [US]) [X] 31,44,45 * page 9, paragraph 2 - page 10, paragraph 3; figure 1 * [A] 9,27,46-51 |