EP1092719 - Imidazo[5,1-f][1,2,4]triazine derivatives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.04.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 12.01.2005 [2005/02] | Applicant(s) | For:GB
Pfizer Limited Ramsgate Road Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | For:BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GR
IE
IT
LI
LU
NL
AT
CY
PT
SE
Pfizer Inc. 235 East 42nd Street New York, NY 10017 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/22] | For:GB
Pfizer Limited Ramsgate Road Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | ||
For:BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GR
IE
IT
LI
LU
NL
AT
CY
PT
SE
PFIZER INC. 235 East 42nd Street New York, N.Y. 10017 / US | |||
Former [2002/22] | For:GB
Pfizer Limited Ramsgate Road Sandwich Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | ||
For:BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GR
IE
IT
LI
LU
NL
AT
CY
PT
SE
PFIZER INC. 235 East 42nd Street New York, N.Y. 10017 / US | |||
Former [2001/16] | For:GB
Pfizer Limited Ramsgate Road Sandwich Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | ||
For:BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
IE
IT
LI
LU
NL
AT
CY
PT
SE
PFIZER INC. 235 East 42nd Street New York, N.Y. 10017 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maw, Graham Nigel Pfizer Central Res., Ramsgate Road Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | [2001/16] | Representative(s) | McNeeney, Stephen Phillip, et al Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/19] | McNeeney, Stephen Phillip, et al Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | ||
Former [2001/16] | Wood, David John, et al PFIZER LIMITED, European Patents Department, Ramsgate Road Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 00308914.1 | 10.10.2000 | [2001/16] | Priority number, date | GB19990024028 | 11.10.1999 Original published format: GB 9924028 | GB20000007345 | 28.03.2000 Original published format: GB 0007345 | [2001/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1092719 | Date: | 18.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1092719 | Date: | 26.09.2001 | [2001/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1092719 | Date: | 28.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C07D487/04, A61K31/53, A61P15/00, C07D401/04, // (C07D487/04, 253:00, 235:00) | [2001/39] | CPC: |
C07D487/04 (EP,US);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P15/10 (EP);
A61P15/12 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2001/16] | C07D487/04, A61K31/53, A61P15/00, // (C07D487/04, 253:00, 235:00) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2003/22] |
Former [2003/03] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE | ||
Former [2001/16] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Imidazo[5,1-f][1,2,4]triazinderivate | [2001/16] | English: | Imidazo[5,1-f][1,2,4]triazine derivatives | [2001/16] | French: | Dérivés d'imidazo[5,1-f][1,2,4]triazine | [2001/16] | Examination procedure | 20.10.2000 | Examination requested [2001/16] | 17.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.03.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 25.03.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | MC | 31.10.2003 | [2005/02] | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]WO9924433 (BAYER AG [DE], et al) [DA] 1,9 * claims 1,10 *; | [PA]WO0024745 (PFIZER LTD [GB], et al) [PA] 1,9* claims 1,13 * |