30.01.2009 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 04.03.2009 [2009/10] |
15.08.2008 |
Change - applicant |
published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] |
22.02.2008 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 26.03.2008 [2008/13] |
23.10.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.09.2007 |
Change - applicant |
published on 17.10.2007 [2007/42] |
31.07.2007 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
31.07.2007 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
06.03.2007 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
12.10.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.07.2006 |
Change - applicant |
published on 16.08.2006 [2006/33] |
01.04.2006 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
16.03.2006 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
20.12.2005 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
04.11.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.09.2005 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
15.06.2005 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
15.06.2005 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
15.04.2005 |
Deletion: Reply to examination report |
|
13.04.2005 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
11.04.2005 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
06.04.2005 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
23.03.2005 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
10.12.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
15.10.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.08.2004 |
First examination report |
|
04.08.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
03.10.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.03.2003 |
Change - extension states |
|
22.11.2002 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 08.01.2003 [2003/02] |
01.11.2002 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 18.12.2002 [2002/51] |
09.10.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
02.03.2002 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 17.04.2002 [2002/16] |