Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1197334 | Global Dossier | 26.03.2008 | B1 | EP1197334 | 17.04.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP00308973 | 12.10.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60038450T | 28.05.2009 | T2 | DE60038450D1 | 08.05.2008 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP00308973 | 12.10.2000 |