EP1197334 - Printing system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.01.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.03.2009 [2009/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US | ||
Former [2007/42] | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | ||
Former [2006/33] | For all designated states Kodak Graphic Communications Company 401 Merritt 7 Norwalk CT 06851 / US | ||
Former [2002/16] | For all designated states Iris Graphics, Inc. 3 Federal Street Billerica, Massachusetts 01821 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pinard, Adam I. 571 Heald Road Carlisle, Massachusetts 01741 / US | [2002/16] | Representative(s) | Kazi, Ilya, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/16] | Kazi, Ilya, et al Mathys & Squire, 100 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | Application number, filing date | 00308973.7 | 12.10.2000 | [2002/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1197334 | Date: | 17.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1197334 | Date: | 26.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/075 | [2002/16] | CPC: |
B41J19/16 (EP);
B41J2/09 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/02] |
Former [2002/16] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Drucksystem | [2002/16] | English: | Printing system | [2002/16] | French: | Système d'impression | [2002/16] | Examination procedure | 17.10.2002 | Examination requested [2002/51] | 09.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.03.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 08.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 30.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.07.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 20.07.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/10] | Request for further processing for: | 31.03.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 31.03.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.06.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3928718 (SAGAE SYOJI, et al) [A] 1-23 * column 4, line 9 - column 8, line 38; figures 1,2 *; | [XY]US4065773 (BERRY JAMES M) [X] 6,7,9,17-19 * column 3, line 21 - column 4, line 26; figure 1 * [Y] 1-5,10-12,14,21,23; | [A]US4069485 (MARTIN VAN CLIFTON) [A] 1-23* column 3, line 48 - column 5, line 9; figures 4-6 *; | [YA]US4525721 (CREAN PETER A [US]) [Y] 1-5,10-12,14,21,23 * column 8, line 57 - column 9, line 46; figures 1,4-6 * [A] 3,4 |