Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
13.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] |
23.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.09.2004 [2004/37] |
05.03.2004 | Change - representative | published on 21.04.2004 [2004/17] |
02.08.2003 | (Expected) grant | published on 17.09.2003 [2003/38] |
07.06.2003 | Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
26.03.2003 | Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
29.10.2002 | Renewal fee | |
03.04.2002 | Change - extension states | |
07.12.2001 | Definitive list of designations | published on 23.01.2002 [2002/04] |
17.03.2001 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 02.05.2001 [2001/18] |
17.03.2001 | Request for examination filed | published on 02.05.2001 [2001/18] |