EP1096025 - Preparation of an aqueous composition for treating leather [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.07.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROHM AND HAAS COMPANY 100 Independence Mall West Philadelphia, PA 19106-2399 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/18] | For all designated states ROHM AND HAAS COMPANY 100 Independence Mall West Philadelphia, Pennsylvania 19106-2399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
El A'mma, Anton Georges 133 Bavington Road Perkiomenville, Pennsylvania 18074 / US | 02 /
Fritsche, Monika Ulrike 431 Brown Briar Circle Horsham, Pennsylvania 19044 / US | 03 /
Hodder, James John 1133 Ferry Road Doylestown, Pennsylvania 18901 / US | [2001/18] | Representative(s) | Kent, Venetia Katherine, et al Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Kent, Venetia Katherine, et al Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE 45 1DZ / GB | ||
Former [2004/17] | Kent, Venetia Katherine, et al Rohm and Haas (UK) Ltd., European Patent Department, 28th Floor, City Point, One Ropemaker Street London EC2Y 9HS / GB | ||
Former [2001/18] | Buckley, Guy Julian ROHM AND HAAS (UK) LTD. European Operations Patent Department Lennig House 2 Mason's Avenue Croydon CR9 3NB / GB | Application number, filing date | 00309149.3 | 17.10.2000 | [2001/18] | Priority number, date | US19990161396P | 25.10.1999 Original published format: US 161396 P | [2001/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1096025 | Date: | 02.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1096025 | Date: | 17.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C14C3/08, C14C11/00 | [2001/18] | CPC: |
C14C11/00 (EP,US);
C14C9/00 (KR);
C14C3/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, NL [2002/04] |
Former [2001/18] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Herstellung einer wässrigen Zusammensetzung, um Leder zu behandeln | [2001/18] | English: | Preparation of an aqueous composition for treating leather | [2001/18] | French: | Préparation d'une composition aqueuse pour le traitement de cuir | [2001/18] | Examination procedure | 25.10.2000 | Examination requested [2001/18] | 02.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.05.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 26.05.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4208184 (BARTHELL EDUARD [DE], et al) [X] 1,6,10 * column 1, line 10 - column 5, line 29 * * examples 1,6,9 * * claims 1,6,9-11 *; | [A]US4732968 (OBAYASHI SHIGEJI [JP], et al) [A] 7,8,10 * column 1, line 7 - column 2, line 9 * * column 3, line 24 - column 6, line 2 * * example 1; claim 1 *; | [X]US4750906 (SCHMIDT RUDOLF [DE]) [X] 1-6 * column 2, line 24 - column 3, line 21 * * example 3 *; | [A]DE19513989 (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 7 * page 2, line 3 - page 3, line 9 ** claims 1,4 * |