EP1095606 - Panels [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.03.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.05.2004 [2004/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sim, Thomas Edwin The Shires, Shirehill Industrial Estate Saffron Walden Essex CB11 3AQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/18] | For all designated states Sim, Thomas Edwin The Shires, Shirehill Industrial Estate Saffron Walden, Essex CB11 3AQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2001/18] | Representative(s) | Britter, Keith Palmer Britter & Co. Enterprise House 14b Whitehorse Street Baldock Hertfordshire SG7 6QN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/18] | Britter, Keith Palmer Britter & Co. Enterprise House 14b Whitehorse Street Baldock Hertfordshire SG7 6QN / GB | Application number, filing date | 00309439.8 | 26.10.2000 | [2001/18] | Priority number, date | GB19990025370 | 27.10.1999 Original published format: GB 9925370 | [2001/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1095606 | Date: | 02.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1095606 | Date: | 29.01.2003 | [2003/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A47K3/16 | [2001/18] | CPC: |
A47K3/161 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/18] | Title | German: | Paneele | [2001/18] | English: | Panels | [2001/18] | French: | Panneaux | [2001/18] | Examination procedure | 19.06.2003 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 21.07.2003 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request granted | 30.07.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/19] | 03.12.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2004/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 17.09.2003 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2002 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   30.04.2003 | 31.10.2003 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2713467 (BORSTCHER GEORGES [FR]) [X] 4 * figures 1,2,4,5; claim 1 *; | [A]DE19546864 (KALDEWEI FRANZ GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] * abstract *; | [XA]BE1010058 (ANDRIES RALPH [BE], et al) [X] 1,2,4 * the whole document * [A] 5; | [A]WO9935948 (KALDEWEI FRANZ GMBH & CO [DE], et al) [A] 4,5 * page 4, line 31 - page 5, line 12 * * page 9, lines 14-38 * * page 23, lines 6-14 * * page 31, line 5 - page 33, line 33; figures 12-14,30,31 *; | [A]DE29905123U (KALDEWEI FRANZ GMBH & CO [DE]) |